Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2216306

EP2216306 - Viscous, granular, hardening coating mass [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/32]Viscous, granular, hardening coating mass
[2015/23]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STO SE & Co. KGaA
Ehrenbachstrasse 1
79780 Stühlingen / DE
[2014/20]
Former [2010/32]For all designated states
STO AG
Ehrenbachstrasse 1
79780 Stühlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Böhler, Joachim
Am Rain 3
79848 Bonndorf / DE
02 / Dunklau, Günter
Deichhausener Str. 46
25761 Büsum / DE
03 / Holder, Theresia
Korngasse 7
79761 Tiengen / DE
 [2015/34]
Former [2010/32]01 / Böhler, Joachim
Am Rain 3
79848 Bonndorf / DE
02 / Dunklau, Günter
Deichhausener Str. 46
25761 Büsum / DE
03 / Holder, Theresia
Korngasse 7
79761 Tiengen / DE
Representative(s)Gottschalk, Matthias
Gottschalk Maiwald
Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwalts- (Schweiz) GmbH
Splügenstrasse 8
8002 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2015/34]Gottschalk, Matthias
Maiwald Patentanwaltsgesellschaft (Schweiz) mbH
Splügenstrasse 8
8002 Zürich / CH
Former [2010/32]Gottschalk, Matthias
c/o Maiwald Patentanwaltsgesellschaft (Schweiz) mbH Splügenstrasse 8
8002 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date10152699.404.02.2010
[2010/32]
Priority number, dateDE2009100791106.02.2009         Original published format: DE102009007911
[2010/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2216306
Date:11.08.2010
Language:DE
[2010/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2216306
Date:19.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2216306
Date:19.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:C04B28/02, C04B26/02, C09D1/04, E04F13/00, C09D5/02, C04B28/10
[2015/15]
Former International [2011/42]C04B28/02, C04B26/02, C09D5/00, E04F13/02, C04B28/10, C04B28/26, C09D1/04, C09D7/12, C09D5/02
Former International [2010/32]C04B28/02, C04B26/02, C09D5/00, E04F13/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/34]
Former [2010/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VISKOSE, KORNHALTIGE AUSHÄRTENDE BESCHICHTUNGSMASSE[2015/23]
English:Viscous, granular, hardening coating mass[2017/47]
French:Masse de revêtement visqueuse, granuleuse, durcissante[2017/47]
Former [2010/32]Viskose, kornhaltige aushärtende Beschichtungsmasse
Former [2010/32]Viscous, granular, hardening coating mass
Former [2010/32]Masse de revêtement visqueuse, granuleuse, durcissante
Examination procedure16.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/09]
10.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.07.2015Fee for grant paid
08.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.09.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.05.2016   
DAW SE
Rossdörfer Strasse 50
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Metten, Karl-Heinz
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/26]
Opponent(s)01  17.05.2016   
DAW SE
Rossdörfer Strasse 50
64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Metten, Karl-Heinz
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
23.06.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition12.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0122/18
16.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
03.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.02.2010
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
SE05.02.2019
NO28.02.2019
[2019/48]
Former [2019/47]HU04.02.2010
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
NO28.02.2019
Former [2018/38]HU04.02.2010
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
Former [2018/29]HU04.02.2010
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU04.02.2010
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
Former [2017/08]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
GB04.02.2016
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
IE04.02.2016
LU04.02.2016
Former [2016/43]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
LU04.02.2016
Former [2016/42]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/21]FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/10]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
GR20.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT19.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP0230220  (STOTMEISTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 32; example 2; claims 1-5 * [A] 10 [I] 7,8;
 [XI]US4735027  (EVANS MICHAEL E [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 23; example II & IV; Formulierungen A & E; claims 1-12 * [I] 7,8;
 [I]EP1593659  (LAFARGE PLATRES [FR]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] - [0047]; examples 1-12; claims 1-25 *;
 [A]DE19910602  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 62; example Rezeptur Beschichtungsmasse *
by applicantDE202005012773U
OppositionDE102009007911
 EP1593659
 EP0230220
 US4735027
 DE4324315
 DE102008004844
 DE4324314
 WO2004087821
 EP1643046
 WO2013078949
 WO02058841
    - G. HERDAN, "Particle size and other characteristics", Small Particle Statistics, pages 256 - 270, XP055291006
    - T. ALLEN, "Particle Size, Shape and Distribution", Particle Size Measurement, London (D3), pages 74 - 76,84-93, XP055291021
    - "technisches Datenblatt Arbocel FIC200", J. Rettenmaier, URL: http://www.grupofiltrantes.com.mx/web/images/FichaTecnica/ARBOCELFIC200.pdf, XP055295456