Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2236474


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.09.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.10.2011  [2011/41]
13.05.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.09.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.10.2010  [2010/40]