Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2236474 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP09152294 EP10152766



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2236474Global Dossier 06.10.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP10152766 05.02.2010
EP09152294 06.02.2009
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202010014322U 30.12.2010U1
Priority number Date
EP10152766 05.02.2010
EP09152294 06.02.2009
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2223903Global Dossier 01.09.2010A1
Priority number Date
EP09152294 06.02.2009