Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2236474

EP2236474 - Thin floating screed [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2011  [2011/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unger, Alexander
Am Spachet 11
86609 Donauwörth / DE
[2010/40]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2010/40]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Andrea
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Steinerstrasse 15/A
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/40]Fleuchaus, Andrea
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date10152766.105.02.2010
[2010/40]
Priority number, dateEP2009015229406.02.2009         Original published format: EP 09152294
[2010/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2236474
Date:06.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:C04B24/02, C04B24/12, C04B28/02
[2010/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/40]
TitleGerman:Dünner schwimmender Estrich[2010/40]
English:Thin floating screed[2010/40]
French:Poutre lisseuse flottante mince[2010/40]
Examination procedure07.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/41]
19.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2011/41]
Documents cited:Search   [] No Search,