Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2216590

EP2216590 - Vehicle lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.12.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koito Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
8-3, Takanawa 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8711 / JP
[2010/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Nakada, Yusuke
c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD
Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki, Shimizu-ku
Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP
 [2015/29]
Former [2010/32]01 / Nakada, Yusuke
c/o KOITO MANUFACTURING CO., LTD Shizuoka Plant, 500, Kitawaki, Shimizu-ku
Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka / JP
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/29]Intès, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Former [2010/32]Intes, Didier Gérard André , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date10152792.705.02.2010
[2010/32]
Priority number, dateJP2009002611006.02.2009         Original published format: JP 2009026110
[2010/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2216590
Date:11.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2216590
Date:15.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/12, // F21Y101/02
[2010/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2010/32]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeuglampe[2010/32]
English:Vehicle lamp[2010/32]
French:Lampe de véhicule[2010/32]
Examination procedure05.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/32]
09.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2015Fee for grant paid
02.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.07.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.04.2016  20.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Valeo Vision SAS
Propriété Industrielle
34, rue Saint André
93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR
 [2018/22]
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  15.04.2016  20.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
VALEO VISION
34, rue Saint-André
93000 Bobigny / FR
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.12.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition13.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0464/18
23.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
21.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.02.2010
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
BG15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MK15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
SM15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
GB05.02.2017
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU05.02.2010
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MK15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
SM15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
GB05.02.2017
Former [2018/30]HU05.02.2010
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IS15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MK15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
SM15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GB05.02.2017
Former [2018/29]HU05.02.2010
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MK15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
SM15.07.2015
TR15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GB05.02.2017
Former [2018/28]HU05.02.2010
AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CY15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MK15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
SM15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GB05.02.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
GB05.02.2017
Former [2017/40]AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
MT15.07.2015
NL15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
IE05.02.2016
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT15.07.2015
BE15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
LU05.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/46]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
LU05.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/43]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
LU05.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
MC15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SI15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
RO15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
SK15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT15.07.2015
CZ15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
EE15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/21]AT15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
IT15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT15.07.2015
DK15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT15.07.2015
ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES15.07.2015
FI15.07.2015
HR15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
PL15.07.2015
SE15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
PT16.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI15.07.2015
LT15.07.2015
LV15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
GR16.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT15.07.2015
NO15.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT15.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[I]US2005094413  (SAZUKA KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0097] * * figures 1,2,10,11,13,14 *;
 [I]US2005231971  (ISHIDA HIROYUKI [JP]) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1-4,7 *
ExaminationUS2004105275
by applicantJP2005141917
OppositionUS2005094413
 US2005231971
 US2004105275
 US2005094414
 US2008007961
 US2006274544
 US2008239744
 US2004125614
 US2007236953
 EP1748251
 EP1912017
 EP1980786
 DE10009590
 DE102007038470
 WO2009092415
    - "XLED", ISAL'07, Darmstadt, (20070900), ISBN 978-3-8316-0711-2, XP055273534