blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2239641

EP2239641 - Device and method for determining operating parameters of a gas-turbine plant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ansaldo Energia S.p.A.
Via Nicola Lorenzi 8
Genova / IT
[2010/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Dodi, Andrea Giuseppe
Via Scarpanto, 8A
16156 Genova / IT
02 / Ferrera, Flavio
Via Padre Semeria, 13/9
16131 Genova / IT
03 / Montanella, Davide
Via dei landi, 14 int. 44
16151 Genova / IT
04 / Pesce, Paolo
Via Coronata, 55/3
16152 Genova / IT
 [2010/41]
Representative(s)Jorio, Paolo, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2012/22]
Former [2010/41]Jorio, Paolo, et al
STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date10152837.005.02.2010
[2010/41]
Priority number, dateIT2009MI0015906.02.2009         Original published format: IT MI20090159
[2010/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2239641
Date:13.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2239641
Date:15.12.2010
[2010/50]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2239641
Date:16.02.2011
[2011/07]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2239641
Date:23.02.2011
[2011/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2239641
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2010
ClassificationIPC:G05B23/02
[2010/41]
CPC:
F02C9/22 (EP); F02C9/00 (EP); F05D2270/303 (EP);
F05D2270/306 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/41]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung der Betriebsparametern einer Gas-Turbinen Anlage[2010/42]
English:Device and method for determining operating parameters of a gas-turbine plant[2010/41]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour la détermination des paramètres de fonctionnement d'une installation de turbine à gas[2010/42]
Former [2010/41]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Betriebsparameter einer Gasturbinenanlage
Former [2010/41]Dispositif et procédé pour déterminer les paramètres de fonctionnement d'une centrale à turbine à gaz
Examination procedure08.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/30]
12.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2012Fee for grant paid
13.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2011
Opposition(s)01.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.02.2010
AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE05.02.2013
LU05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MK30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
TR30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2015/24]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
SM30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
MT30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
BG30.08.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/22]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
ES10.09.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
PT01.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
IT30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
PL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/10]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
CZ30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
RO30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
SK30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
EE30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
DK30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
NL30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT30.05.2012
BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2013/04]BE30.05.2012
CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
SI30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/50]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
HR30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
LV30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
GR31.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY30.05.2012
FI30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
IS30.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI30.05.2012
LT30.05.2012
SE30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
Former [2012/47]LT30.05.2012
NO30.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1286031  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13 * paragraph [0049] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.