EP2219239 - Semiconductor light emitting diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/33] | Semiconductor light emitting device | ||
[2014/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 416, Hangang-daero Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | [2014/24] |
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | ||
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 33Fl., LG Twin Tower West 20, Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Hwan Hee 204-602, Sinjeong Hyeondae Home Town Apt., Yaeum-dong, Nam-gu Ulsan / KR | [2015/18] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
Jeong, Hwan Hee 204-602, Sinjeong Hyeondae Home Town Apt., Yaeum-dong, Nam-gu Ulsan / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/33] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10153505.2 | 12.02.2010 | [2010/33] | Priority number, date | KR20090012483 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: KR 20090012483 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2219239 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2219239 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219239 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/44, // H01L33/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
H10H20/84 (EP,US);
H10H20/018 (EP,US);
H10H20/882 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterleuchtdiode | [2014/50] | English: | Semiconductor light emitting diode | [2014/50] | French: | Diode électroluminescente à semi-conducteurs | [2014/50] |
Former [2010/33] | Lichtemittierendes Halbleiterbauelement | ||
Former [2010/33] | Semiconductor light emitting device | ||
Former [2010/33] | Dispositif électroluminescent semi-conducteur | Examination procedure | 12.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2010 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.02.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.02.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.02.2010 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004104390 (SANO MASAHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2006027815 (WIERER JONATHAN J JR [US], et al); | [X]US2006163599 (TSAI TZONG-LIANG [TW], et al); | [X]WO2008135013 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE], et al) |