Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2221887

EP2221887 - Light emitting device, light emitting device package and lighting system including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.08.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu
Seoul, 04637 / KR
[2017/20]
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
Seoul Square
416, Hangang-daero
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-714 / KR
Former [2010/42]For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
Seoul Square 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu
Seoul 100-714 / KR
Former [2010/34]For all designated states
LG Innotek Co., Ltd.
33Fl., LG Twin Tower West 20, Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Choi, Jeong Hyeon
403ho, 602-47 Namhyeon-dong
Gwanak-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Jae Wook
5-1013, Daegyo Apt.
Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
03 / Kang, Jeung Mo
124-1602, Hwanggol Maeul 1 Danji Apt.
Yeongong 1-dong
Yeongong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR
04 / Kim, Du Hyun, LG Electronics
LED Institute, IP Group
16 Woomyeon-Dong
Seocho-Gu Seoul / KR
 [2018/07]
Former [2010/34]01 / Choi, Jeong Hyeon
403ho, 602-47 Namhyeon-dong Gwanak-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Kim, Jae Wook
5-1013, Daegyo Apt. Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul / KR
03 / Kang, Jeung Mo
124-1602, Hwanggol Maeul 1 Danji Apt. Yeongong 1-dong Yeongong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-Do / KR
04 / Kim, Du Hyun, LG Electronics
LED Institute, IP Group 16 Woomyeon-Dong
Seocho-Gu Seoul / KR
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/07]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/42]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2010/34]Dreiss
Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1
70188 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10153593.815.02.2010
[2010/34]
Priority number, dateKR2009001425720.02.2009         Original published format: KR 20090014257
[2010/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2221887
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2221887
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/44, H01S5/028, // H01L33/22
[2010/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
Former [2010/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Lichtemittierende Vorrichtung, Gehäuse für lichtemittierende Vorrichtung und Beleuchtungssystem damit[2010/34]
English:Light emitting device, light emitting device package and lighting system including the same[2010/34]
French:Dispositif électroluminescent, emballage de dispositif électroluminescent et système d'éclairage l'incluant[2010/34]
Examination procedure15.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
13.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2017Fee for grant paid
11.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.08.2010
Opposition(s)15.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
17.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
24.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
IE15.02.2018
LU15.02.2018
MT15.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
FR14.04.2018
BG14.05.2018
GB14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/23]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
IE15.02.2018
LU15.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
FR14.04.2018
BG14.05.2018
GB14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2019/21]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
IE15.02.2018
LU15.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
GB14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
IE15.02.2018
LU15.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2019/09]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
IE15.02.2018
LU15.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
MC14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
SM14.02.2018
LU15.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US3849738  (HAKKI B) [X] 1-4,10,12 * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 35; figures 1,2 * [I] 13,14;
 [XYI]JPS6447082  (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-4,6,10,12 * abstract * [Y] 5,7-9,11 [I] 13,14;
 [Y]US3858965  (SUMITA HARUKI) [Y] 5,7-9 * claim 1; table 1 *;
 [Y]US2002042157  (KIKAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0008] *;
 [Y]US2007187702  (LEE TAE WON [KR], et al) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0065]; figure 6 *;
 [A]DE10339982  (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [A] 12 * figure 4d *;
 [A]US2007069228  (MILLER JEFFREY N [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *