blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2226379

EP2226379 - Dissolvable laundry detergent sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.06.2015
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.07.2015  [2015/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dizolve Group Corporation
300 Baig Blvd. Suite 3C
Moncton, New Brunswick E1E 1C8 / CA
[2010/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Jalbert, Luc
46 Richard Hil Road, Shediac
New Brunswick E4R 1R7 / CA
02 / Surette, Marc
300 Baig blvd,. Suite C3, Moncton
New Brunswick E4E 1C8 / CA
 [2010/36]
Representative(s)Gaunt, Robert John, et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Gaunt, Robert John
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1, Pemberton Row London
EC4A 3BG / GB
Former [2010/36]Marles, Alan David
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date10155225.502.03.2010
[2010/36]
Priority number, dateUS20090156866P02.03.2009         Original published format: US 156866 P
[2010/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2226379
Date:08.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2010
ClassificationIPC:C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11D17/06
[2010/36]
CPC:
C11D17/06 (EP,US); C11D3/222 (EP,US); C11D3/3753 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Lösliches Waschmittelblatt[2010/36]
English:Dissolvable laundry detergent sheet[2010/36]
French:Feuille de détergent de blanchisserie pouvant être dissous[2010/36]
Examination procedure07.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/16]
22.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
01.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2013Date of oral proceedings
08.03.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/31]
13.04.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/31]
Appeal following examination10.05.2013Appeal received No.  T1756/13
19.07.2013Statement of grounds filed
13.04.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
13.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.04.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201506   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2004087857  (MACQUARRIE REG [CA]) [I] 1-15 * examples 5,6 *;
 [I]US3904543  (KNIGHTEN JAMES G) [I] 1-15 * examples 5,6 *;
 [I]WO2007034471  (ICHT SAMUEL [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 6, line 29 - line 30; claims 1-3,35-37 *
by applicantUS4938888
 US4853142
 US6818606
 US7094744
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.