Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2218654

EP2218654 - Cap and container assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/33]Cap for a moisture tight cap and container assembly
[2011/27]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2012
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSP Technologies, Inc.
1030 Riverfront Center P.O. Box 710 Amsterdam
New York 12010 / US
[2010/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Giraud, Jean-Pierre
3576 Ridgeview Court
Auburn, Alabama 36830-1295 / US
 [2011/01]
Former [2010/33]01 / Giraud, Jean Pierre
7, rue de la Nativite
75012, Paris / FR
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/11]Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2010/33]Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date10155973.010.10.2003
[2010/33]
Priority number, dateUS20020417533P10.10.2002         Original published format: US 417533 P
[2010/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2218654
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2218654
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:B65D81/26, B65D69/00, B65D73/00, B65D1/24, B65D51/18
[2010/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/33]
TitleGerman:Verschlusskappe und Behälteranordung[2011/27]
English:Cap and container assembly[2011/27]
French:Ensemble capuchon-récipient[2011/27]
Former [2010/33]Verschlusskappe für eine flüssigkeitsdichte Verschlusskappen- und Behälteranordung
Former [2010/33]Cap for a moisture tight cap and container assembly
Former [2010/33]Capuchon pour un ensemble capuchon-récipient étanche à l'humidité
Examination procedure09.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
09.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2011Fee for grant paid
28.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03773225.2  / EP1567425
Divisional application(s)EP11157224.4  / EP2327637
EP14170403.1  / EP2796386
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030773225) is  13.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.12.2012  17.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Lenbachplatz 6
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/04]
Opponent(s)01  14.12.2012   
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Lenbachplatz 6
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
22.01.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.07.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.05.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.06.2014
02.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2014Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2014Reply to a communication from the opposition division
10.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition20.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0099/16
18.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
12.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0099/16
18.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.03.2012
LU10.10.2012
MC31.10.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2012/41]CY14.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO0046118  (PCC TECHNOLOGIES PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,14 * page 6, line 18 - line 19; figure - * [Y] 15 [I] 10,11;
 [XI]US5842486  (DAVIS LAWRENCE G [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,14 * column 4, line 57 - line 64; figure - * [I] 10,11;
 [Y]EP0079816  (PLASTIGORD SA [FR]) [Y] 15 * figure -; claim 9 *;
 [X]US5437386  (VON HOLDT JOHN W [US]) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,14 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 68; figure - *
ExaminationDE2850592
by applicantDE29705720U
 WO0046118
 US5842486
 US5911937
 US6214255
 US6130263
 US6080350
 US6174952
 US6124006
 US6221446
 USRE37676E
 US5723085
 US4812116
 US4783056