Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2230605

EP2230605 - Accessory and mobile computing device communication using an application communication protocol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2011
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2010/38]For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Holden, Paul
c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 81-1TF
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / Bolton, Lawrence
c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 81-2PT
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
03 / Ganatra, Nitin
c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 302-1NS
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
04 / Adler, Mitchell
c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 302-4K
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
05 / Clark Schubert, Emily
c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 81-2PT
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
06 / Dorogusker, Jesse Lee
c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop MS 81-2PT
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2010/38]
Representative(s)Barton, Russell Glen , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/24]Barton, Russell Glen , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2010/38]Gillard, Matthew Paul
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date10156564.615.03.2010
[2010/38]
Priority number, dateUS20090160601P16.03.2009         Original published format: US 160601 P
US20090160644P16.03.2009         Original published format: US 160644 P
[2010/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2230605
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42
[2010/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zusätzliche und mobile Computervorrichtungskommunikation unter Verwendung eines Anwendungskommunikationsprotokolls[2010/38]
English:Accessory and mobile computing device communication using an application communication protocol[2010/38]
French:Accessoire et communication de dispositif informatique mobile utilisant un protocole de communication d'application[2010/38]
Examination procedure15.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
21.03.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.11.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination24.01.2014Appeal received No.  T1013/14
07.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP11192238.1  / EP2428899
EP13166559.8  / EP2642401
EP13166560.6  / EP2642402
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007066174  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 19 *;
 [A]US2008320190  (LYDON GREGORY T [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - BLUETOOTH SIG, "Architecture & Terminology Overview and Core system package", (20070726), SPECIFICATION OF THE BLUETOOTH SYSTEM: Core version 2.1+EDR, URL: http://www.bluetooth.com/SiteCollectionDocuments/Core_V21__EDR.zip, (20100518), XP002582775 [X] 1-4,6-12,14 * vol. 1, part A: par. 1, par. 1.1, par. 2, par. 3.1, par. 4.2.1, par. 5.4.1 * * vol. 3, part A, par. 4, par. 7.3 * * vol. 3, part B: par. 1.1-1.3, par. 2.1-2.6, par. 3, par. 4, par. 5.1.5 * [Y] 5,13
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "Reverse-DNS", Wikipedia, (20090214), Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Reverse-DNS&oldid=270747273, XP002582776 [Y] 5,13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Bluetooth", (20090227), Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Bluetooth&oldid=273620532, XP002582777 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2007066174
    - BLUETOOTH SIG: ARCHITECTURE & TERMINOLOGY OVERVIEW AND CORE SYSTEM PACKAGE SPECIFICATION OF THE BLUETOOTH SYSTEM, (20070726), vol. 1, 3