blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2230825

EP2230825 - Portable electronic apparatus and portable terminal system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, MK
published on 29.07.2020  [2020/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[2010/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Ishibashi, Takanobu
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2017/34]
Former [2017/27]01 / Ishibashi, Takanobu
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1- chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Former [2017/24]01 / Ishibashi, Takanobu
c/o Intellectual Property Division
Toshiba Corporation
1-1, Shibaura 1 chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Former [2010/38]01 / Ishibashi, Takanobu
Toshiba Corporation c/o Intellectual Property Divi
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2017/24]
Former [2010/38]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date10156607.316.03.2010
[2010/38]
Priority number, dateJP2009006700618.03.2009         Original published format: JP 2009067006
[2010/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2230825
Date:22.09.2010
Language:EN
[2010/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2230825
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2230825
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2012
ClassificationIPC:H04M1/725
[2010/38]
CPC:
H04M1/72412 (EP,US); H04M2250/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
Former [2010/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbare elektronische Vorrichtung und tragbares Endgerätsystem[2010/38]
English:Portable electronic apparatus and portable terminal system[2010/38]
French:Appareil électronique portable et système terminal portable[2010/38]
Examination procedure16.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/38]
02.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2017Fee for grant paid
25.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.10.2015
Opposition(s)15.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
10.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.03.2010
AT14.06.2017
CY14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MK14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
PT14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
[2020/31]
Former [2020/27]HU16.03.2010
AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
PT14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2020/15]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
TR14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/52]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/39]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.06.2017
CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/52]ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/50]ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/49]ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1403761  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 16] - [0035] * * figures 1, 4, 6 * * paragraphs [0060] - [0071] * * paragraphs [0080] - [0103] *;
 [X]EP1408649  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0042] - [0076] * * figures 4-6, 19, 20 * * paragraphs [0085] - [0092] ** paragraphs [0208] - [0267] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.