Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2233326

EP2233326 - Tow bar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.11.2014
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACPS Automotive GmbH
Steinbeisstrasse 6
71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2018/02]For all designated states
Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V.
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5
4131 PK Vianen / NL
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Former [2010/39]For all designated states
SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Wieczorek, Romeo
Waldackerweg 77/1
73732 Esslingen / DE
02 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstraße 37
71679 Asperg / DE
 [2014/49]
Former [2010/39]01 / Wieczorek, Romeo
Waldackerweg 77/1
73732 Esslingen / DE
02 / Riehle, Jörg
Lehenstraße 37
71679 Asperg / DE
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/39]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10157255.022.03.2010
[2010/39]
Priority number, dateDE2009101591625.03.2009         Original published format: DE102009015916
[2010/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2233326
Date:29.09.2010
Language:DE
[2010/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2233326
Date:03.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/54
[2010/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2010/39]
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2010/39]
English:Tow bar[2010/39]
French:Attelage[2010/39]
Examination procedure15.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/12]
01.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.10.2013Fee for grant paid
30.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2014Fee for grant paid
22.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.09.2015   
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
 [2015/41]
16.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.04.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
02.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition29.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1467/17
04.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1467/17
31.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
16.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.03.2010
BG03.12.2014
CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
MK03.12.2014
MT03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
SM03.12.2014
TR03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
AT22.03.2015
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/39]HU22.03.2010
BG03.12.2014
CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
MT03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
SM03.12.2014
TR03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
AT22.03.2015
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
BE31.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2017/03]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
MT03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
AT22.03.2015
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2016/36]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
AT22.03.2015
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2016/12]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SI03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2016/07]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
IE22.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2016/06]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2016/03]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
IT03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/50]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
DK03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/47]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
LU22.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/46]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
MC03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/38]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
IS03.04.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
PL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
SK03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/36]CY03.12.2014
CZ03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
RO03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/35]CY03.12.2014
EE03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
PT03.04.2015
Former [2015/26]CY03.12.2014
ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
HR03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
LV03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
SE03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
GR04.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES03.12.2014
FI03.12.2014
LT03.12.2014
NL03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT03.12.2014
NO03.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT03.12.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1288026  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0215] - [0222]; figures 1-24 *;
 [A]EP1024036  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0044] - [0046]; figures 1-26f; claims 1,43-49 *;
 [A]EP1557298  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1-18 *;
 [AP]EP2130698  (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1 * paragraphs [0141] - [0144]; figure 17 *
by applicantEP1886847
 EP1002671