Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2368921

EP2368921 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF FLOWABLE COMONOMER RICH POLYPROPYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/39]Process of flowable comonomer rich polypropylene
[2014/32]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2011/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Tuominen, Olli
Esikkopolku 4
00930 Helsinki / FI
02 / Malm, Bo
Harjuviita 16 A 27
02110 Espoo / FI
03 / Leskinen, Pauli
Tuiskutie 5a
00700 Helsinki / FI
 [2011/39]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2011/39]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date10157879.726.03.2010
[2011/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2368921
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2368921
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/06, C08F2/00, C08F297/08, C08L23/14, C08F210/06
[2011/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren für fließfähiges, comonomerreiches Polypropylen[2017/25]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF FLOWABLE COMONOMER RICH POLYPROPYLENE[2014/32]
French:Procédé de polypropylène fluide riche en comonomères[2017/25]
Former [2011/39]Verfahren für fließfähiges, comonomerreiches Polypropylen
Former [2011/39]Process of flowable comonomer rich polypropylene
Former [2011/39]Procédé de polypropylène fluide riche en comonomères
Examination procedure10.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2012Examination requested  [2012/14]
05.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2014Fee for grant paid
15.10.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.10.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.08.2015  03.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pontaccio 10
20121 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Colucci, Giuseppe, et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Piazzale G. Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
 [2019/01]
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  20.08.2015   
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Via Pergolesi 25
20124 Milano / IT
Opponent's representative
Colucci, Giuseppe, et al
Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Piazzale G. Donegani 12
44122 Ferrara / IT
02.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.03.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.05.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1626/17
02.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2010
AT26.11.2014
BE26.11.2014
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MK26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
SM26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2018/30]
Former [2017/46]HU26.03.2010
AT26.11.2014
BE26.11.2014
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
SM26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/38]HU26.03.2010
AT26.11.2014
BG26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
SM26.11.2014
TR26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
MT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SI26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
MC26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/37]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
PL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
SK26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/36]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
CZ26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
RO26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
DK26.11.2014
EE26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/26]AT26.11.2014
CY26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/25]AT26.11.2014
ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/24]ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
HR26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
LV26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
SE26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
GR27.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/23]ES26.11.2014
FI26.11.2014
LT26.11.2014
NL26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
IS26.03.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
PT26.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT26.11.2014
NO26.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT26.11.2014
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2010006961  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-14 * claim - * [A] 15;
 [XA]WO2008015113  (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT]) [X] 1-14 * example -; claim - * [A] 15;
 [XA]WO2009153213  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-14 * claim - * [A] 15;
 [XDA]WO2004000899  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [XD] 1-14 * claim - * [A] 15;
 [XA]EP1236769  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1-14 * claim - * [A] 15;
 [XA]EP2065404  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0005]; claim - * [A] 15;
 [EL]WO2010057915  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * [L] ;
 [EL]WO2010057916  (BOREALIS AG [AT], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document * [L]
by applicantEP0491566
 EP0586390
 WO9812234
 EP0887379
 WO9212182
 WO2004000899
 WO2004111095
 WO9924478
 WO9924479
 WO0068315
    - THERMOCHIMICA ACTA, (1990), vol. 66, pages 53 - 68