blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2371726

EP2371726 - Crate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.09.2012  [2012/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IFCO Systems GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 7
82049 Pullach / DE
[2011/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Orgeldinger, Wolfgang
/ Zugspitzstrasse 7
82049 Pullach / DE
 [2011/40]
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/40]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date10158381.330.03.2010
[2011/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2371726
Date:05.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2010
ClassificationIPC:B65D21/02, B65D85/34, B65D6/00
[2011/40]
CPC:
B65D11/1833 (EP); B65D11/20 (EP); B65D21/0213 (EP);
B65D85/34 (EP); B65D85/345 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/40]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kiste[2011/40]
English:Crate[2011/40]
French:Caisse[2011/40]
Examination procedure06.04.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/39]
14.05.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201203   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009261092  (BLANCHARD WESLEY J [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-31b *;
 [X]US6386388  (OVERHOLT TRENTON M [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 7, line 39 - column 17, line 22 * * figures 1-51 *;
 [X]US2002158067  (OVERHOLT TRENTON M [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0089] * * figures 1-36 *;
 [A]DE102006005873  (SOEHNER KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]GB1323289  (ROSE MILLER G P) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 34 * * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.