Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2214015

EP2214015 - Hydrophilic diagnostic devices for use in the assaying of biological fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.09.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2017Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADHESIVES RESEARCH, INC.
P.O. Box 100 Glen Rock
PA 17327 / US
[2010/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Meathrel, William G.
2339 Fairway Drive
York, PA 17404 / US
02 / Hand, Herbert M., Sr.
806 Chambers Circle
Bel Air, MD 21014 / US
03 / Su, Li-Hung
25 Parkview Drive
Loganville, PA 17342 / US
 [2011/44]
Former [2010/31]01 / Meathrel, William G.
2339 Fairway Drive
York, PA 17404 / US
02 / Hand, Herbert M., Sr.
806 Chambers Circle
Bel Air, MD 21014 / US
03 / Su, Li-Hung
25 Parkview Drive
Loganville, PA 17342 / US
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/16]Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2011/23]Stones, James Alexander , et al
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2010/31]Burford, Anthony Frederick
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London
WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date10158529.719.04.2002
[2010/31]
Priority number, dateUS20010284527P19.04.2001         Original published format: US 284527 P
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2214015
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2214015
Date:02.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/537, B01L3/00
[2010/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2010/31]
TitleGerman:Hydrophile Diagnosevorrichtungen zur Verwendung beim Testen biologischer Flüssigkeiten[2010/31]
English:Hydrophilic diagnostic devices for use in the assaying of biological fluids[2010/31]
French:Dispositifs diagnostiques hydrophiles utilisés dans l'analyse de fluides biologiques[2010/31]
Examination procedure02.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/11]
16.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2011Fee for grant paid
14.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02728841.4  / EP1390750
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020728841) is  23.01.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.08.2012  09.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Zacco GmbH
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Zacco GmbH, et al
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
 [2014/52]
Former [2012/37]
Opponent(s)01  02.08.2012  09.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Zacco GmbH
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmidt, Karsten
ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
10.09.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.03.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.11.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2015
04.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.09.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition18.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2504/16
19.01.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9839645  (OH CHAN S) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]WO9958245  (AMERSHAM PHARM BIOTECH AB) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [Y]EP0408378  (GORE W L & ASS UK) [Y] 1-15 * page 2 - page 5; claim - *;
 [Y]DE3903126  (EIKEN CHEMICAL) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [YP]WO0204570  (A V TOPCHIEV INST OF PETROCHEM [RU]; FELDSTEIN MIKHAIL M [RU]; PLATE N) [YP] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6121508  (BISCHOF KATHARINA J [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [YP]  - P. GRODZINSKI ET AL, "Development of plastic microfluidic devices for sample preparation", BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, (200112), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1023/A:1012400629650, ISSN 1387-2176, pages 275 - 283, XP002585080 [YP] 1-15 * page 275 - page 277; figures 1-4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012400629650
 [Y]  - JAMES LEE L ET AL, "DESIGN AND FABRICATION OF CD-LIKE MICROFLUIDIC PLATFORMS FOR DIAGNOSTICS: POLYMER-BASED MICROFABRICATION", BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1023/A:1012469017354, (20010101), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1387-2176, pages 339 - 351, XP009015637 [Y] 1-15 * page 349 - page 350; figure 12 (b) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012469017354