Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2202482

EP2202482 - Apparatus and method for relocating an articulating-arm coordinate measuring machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2012
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.02.2012  [2012/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Faro Technologies, Inc.
125 Technology Park
Lake Mary, FL 32746-6204 / US
[2010/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Raab, Simon
2692 Sycamore Canyon Road
SANTA BARBARA, CA, 93108 / US
 [2010/26]
Representative(s)Delorme, Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/26]Delorme, Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date10159062.823.06.2006
[2010/26]
Priority number, dateUS20050693295P23.06.2005         Original published format: US 693295 P
[2010/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2202482
Date:30.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01B21/04
[2010/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2010/26]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Zurücksetzung einer Gelenkarmkoordinatenmessmaschine[2010/26]
English:Apparatus and method for relocating an articulating-arm coordinate measuring machine[2010/26]
French:Dispositif et procédé de relocalisation d'un appareil de mesure de coordonnées à bras articulé[2010/26]
Examination procedure27.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.12.2010Examination requested  [2011/06]
18.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/08]
05.10.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/08]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06785365.5  / EP1893942
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060785365) is  31.03.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003206285  (LAU KAM C [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1,6,7,10,11,14 * * paragraphs [0041] - [0043] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0082] - [0084] * * paragraphs [0092] , [0093] *;
 [X]US2003048459  (GOOCH RICHARD MICHAEL [GB]) [X] 1-11 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0047] , [0053] *;
 [X]US6069700  (RUDNICK FREDRICK C [US], et al) [X] 9-12 * figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 50 - column 7, line 36 *;
 [X]US4691446  (PITCHES BRIAN E [GB], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 19 *;
 [X]US4714339  (LAU KAM C [US], et al) [X] 9-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5402582
 US4790651
 US4714339