Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2378444

EP2378444 - Method, device and computer program product for determining an electromagnetic near field of a field excitation source for an electrical system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, IE
published on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CST-Computer Simulation Technology AG
Bad Nauheimer Straße 19
64289 Darmstadt / DE
[2011/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Schöberl, Joachim
Haus-Heyden Straße 228
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
02 / Koutschan, Christoph
Eichenweg 1
96271 Grub am Forst / DE
03 / Paule, Peter
Buchenweg 11
4203 Altenberg bei Linz / AT
 [2011/42]
Representative(s)Spachmann, Holger , et al
Stumpf Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Alte Weinsteige 73
70597 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/49]Spachmann, Holger , et al
Stumpf Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Alte Weinsteige 71
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/37]Spachmann, Holger , et al
Kaufmann & Stumpf
Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft
Alte Weinsteige 71
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2011/42]Kaufmann, Ursula Josefine
Kaufmann & Stumpf Patentanwalts-Partnerschaft Alte Weinsteige 71
70597 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10159805.013.04.2010
[2011/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2378444
Date:19.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2378444
Date:29.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/50
[2011/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2011/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesAL28.02.2012
BA28.02.2012
ME28.02.2012
RS28.02.2012
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Computerprogrammprodukt zur Bestimmung eines elektromagnetischen Nahfeldes einer Feldanregungsquelle eines elektrischen Systems[2011/42]
English:Method, device and computer program product for determining an electromagnetic near field of a field excitation source for an electrical system[2011/42]
French:Procédé, dispositif et produit de programme informatique destinés à la détermination d'un champ de proximité électromagnétique d'une source d'excitation de champ d'un système électrique[2011/42]
Examination procedure02.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/42]
19.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2015Fee for grant paid
18.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2011
Opposition(s)02.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
AT13.04.2016
IE13.04.2016
LU13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
[2017/38]
Former [2017/07]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
LU13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
CH30.04.2016
LI30.04.2016
Former [2017/04]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
LU13.04.2016
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SI29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
BE30.04.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
RO29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
SK29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ29.07.2015
DK29.07.2015
EE29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/21]DK29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
IT29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/20]DK29.07.2015
ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/14]ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NL29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/10]ES29.07.2015
FI29.07.2015
HR29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
PL29.07.2015
SE29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
IS29.11.2015
PT30.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI29.07.2015
LT29.07.2015
LV29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
GR30.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT29.07.2015
NO29.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT29.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]  - KEERTI S KONA ET AL, "Implementation of Discontinuous Galerkin (DG) method for antenna applications", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, 2007 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0877-1, pages 4995 - 4998, XP031170311 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - STEPHEN D GEDNEY ET AL, "The Discontinuous Galerkin Finite Element Time Domain Method (DGFETD): A High Order, Globally-Explicit Method for Parallel Computation", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY. EMC. SYMPOSIUM RECORD. MINNEAPOLIS, MN, AUG. 19 - 23, 2002; [INTERNATIONL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20070701), ISBN 978-0-7803-7264-1, pages 1 - 3, XP031128061 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GOEDEL N ET AL, "Local timestepping discontinuous Galerkin methods for electromagnetic RF field problems", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, 2009. EUCAP 2009. 3RD EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090323), ISBN 978-1-4244-4753-4, pages 2149 - 2153, XP031470217 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - GODEL N ET AL, "Time domain discontinuous Galerkin method with efficient modelling of boundary conditions for simulations of electromagnetic wave propagation", ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY AND 19TH INTERNATIONAL ZURICH SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY, 2008. APEMC 2008. ASIA-PACIFIC SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080519), ISBN 978-981-08-0629-3, pages 594 - 597, XP031283991 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [X]  - HARALD SONGORO ET AL, "Keeping Time with Maxwell's Equations", IEEE MICROWAVE MAGAZINE, IEEESERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/MMM.2010.935779, (20100401), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1527-3342, pages 42 - 49, XP011290479 [X] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMM.2010.935779
 [A]  - IRINA MUNTEANU ET AL, "It's About Time", IEEE MICROWAVE MAGAZINE, IEEESERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/MMM.2010.935775, (20100401), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1527-3342, pages 60 - 69, XP011290483 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMM.2010.935775
Examination   - Christoph Koutschan, "Advanced Applications of the Holonomic Systems Approach", Dissertation, (200909), Johannes Kepler Universität Linz, URL: http://www.risc.jku.at/publications/download/risc_3886/thesisKoutschan.pdf, (20110413),
    - HESTHAVEN J S ET AL, "Nodal high-order methods on unstructured grids. I. Time-domain solution of Maxwell's equations", DATABASE INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (20020901), Database accession no. 7435812,
    - Journal of Computational Physics Academic Press USA, vol. 181, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1006/JCPH.2002.7118, ISSN 0021-9991, pages 186 - 221,
by applicant   - T. WEILAND, "Eine Methode zur Lösung der Maxwellschen-Gleichungen für sechskomponentige Felder auf Diskreter Basis", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION (AEÜ), (197703), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 116 - 120,
    - KANE YEE, "Numerical Solution of Initial Boundary Value Problems Involving Maxwell's Equations in Isotropic Media", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE TRANSACTIONS, (1966), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1109/TAP.1966.1138693, pages 302 - 307, XP011264851

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.1966.1138693
    - J. C. NEDELEC, "Mixed Finite Elements in R^3", NUMERISCHE MATHEMATIK, (1980), vol. 35, pages 315 - 341,
    - GARY C. COHEN, Higher-Order Numerical Methods for Transient Wave Equations, SPRINGER, (2002),
    - MOSHE DUBINER, "Spectral methods on triangles and other domains", JOURNAL OF SCIENTIFIC COMPUTING, (1991), vol. 6, pages 345 - 390,
    - JAN S. HESTHAVEN; TIM WARBURTON, Nodal Discontinuous Galerkin Methods - Algorithms, Analysis, and Applications, SPRINGER SCIENCE+BUSINESS MEDIA, (2008),
    - GEORGE EM KARNIADAKIS; SPENCER SHERWIN, Spectral/hp Element Methods for Computational Fluid Dynamics, OXFORD UNIV. PRESS, (2005),
    - FREDERIC CHYZAK, "Fonctions holonomes en Calcul formel", PHD THESIS, (1998),
    - CHRISTOPH KOUTSCHAN, "Advanced Applications of the Holonomic Systems Approach", PHD THESIS, (2009),
    - DORON ZEILBERGER, "A holonomic systems approach to special function identities", JOURNAL OF COMPUTATIONAL AND APPLIED MATHEMATICS, (1990), vol. 32, no. 3, pages 321 - 368,