blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2378444 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2378444



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 415
03.06.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.07.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.07.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.06.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.06.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.06.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
18.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.06.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.06.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.06.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
09.06.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
09.06.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 48
27.05.2015 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
29.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
29.04.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
29.04.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
29.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.04.2015 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
27.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
27.02.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 48
04.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
04.02.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
04.02.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
04.02.2015 Description Search / examination 9
04.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.02.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.12.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
08.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
18.10.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
12.10.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
28.02.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.02.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.10.2011 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
21.09.2011 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
22.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
22.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 5
22.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
19.04.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
19.04.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.02.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
02.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
02.02.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.02.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
02.02.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 10
30.09.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.09.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 5
30.09.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
01.06.2010 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 6
13.04.2010 Description Search / examination 32
13.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.04.2010 Drawings Search / examination 7
13.04.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5