blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2378444
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8868382Global Dossier 21.10.2014B2
US2011251832 13.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP10159805 13.04.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2378444Global Dossier 29.07.2015B1
EP2378444 19.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
EP10159805 13.04.2010