Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2206540

EP2206540 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SIMULATING A ROCK BAND EXPERIENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/28]System and method for simulating a rock band experience
[2010/42]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.08.2016  [2016/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.
625 Massachusetts Avenue 2nd Floor
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2010/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Kay, Robert
c/o Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 625 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / Lopiccolo, Greg
c/o Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 625 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / Schmidt, Dan
c/o Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 625 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
04 / Rigopulos, Alexander
c/o Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 625 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
05 / Teasdale, Dan
c/o Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 625 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
06 / Foster, Chris
c/o Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. 625 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
 [2010/28]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/28]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date10161233.116.06.2008
[2010/28]
Priority number, dateUS20070944054P14.06.2007         Original published format: US 944054 P
[2010/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2206540
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/10, G10H7/00
[2010/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SIMULATION EINER ROCKBANDERFAHRUNG[2010/42]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SIMULATING A ROCK BAND EXPERIENCE[2010/42]
French:Systèmes et procédés de simulation d'un groupe de rock[2010/28]
Former [2010/28]System und verfahren zur simulation einer rockbanderfahrung
Former [2010/28]System and method for simulating a rock band experience
Examination procedure27.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/28]
14.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/34]
19.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08771169.3  / EP2173444
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080771169) is  20.01.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201104   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1029566  (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 40] , [0059]; figures 18, 34 *;
 [A]US2007087835  (VAN LUCHENE ANDREW S [US] VAN LUCHENE ANDREW STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0994] - [0996] *;
 [A]EP1145749  (KONAMI CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0019] - [0024]; figure 4 *