Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2213185 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2213185



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1113
29.01.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
24.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.01.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
18.01.2019 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
17.01.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
17.01.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
17.01.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.12.2018 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 4
18.12.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.12.2018 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
18.12.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 4
19.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
19.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.11.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
19.11.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.11.2018 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.11.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
19.11.2018 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
22.06.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 14
22.06.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 14
05.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
04.04.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
27.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
22.03.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.04.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
24.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
24.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
24.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
24.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
24.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
24.03.2016 Claims Appeal 3
24.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
24.03.2016 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
20.01.2016 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.01.2016 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
15.01.2016 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.01.2016 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
16.09.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
07.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
07.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 25
07.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 43
07.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
07.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
07.09.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 33
06.07.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
06.07.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
26.06.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
23.06.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
04.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.05.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.04.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
28.04.2015 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 24
28.04.2015 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 12
28.04.2015 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
28.04.2015 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
03.03.2015 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 21
09.02.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2015 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
03.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.02.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.2015 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
29.01.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
13.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.01.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
30.12.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 3
12.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
07.08.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
07.08.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.08.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.07.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
19.07.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.07.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
27.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
12.06.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
12.06.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
23.04.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.03.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.03.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.03.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.03.2013 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.03.2013 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.03.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
18.01.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
11.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.01.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.09.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.09.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.08.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
09.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
09.08.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 14
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 29
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.08.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.10.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.09.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.09.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
23.08.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.08.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.05.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.05.2011 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
29.04.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
29.04.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
29.04.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
29.04.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
21.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 23
21.01.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 23
21.01.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
21.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2011 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
09.08.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.08.2010 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.07.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 4
07.07.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 1
24.06.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
18.06.2010 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
11.05.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
28.04.2010 Description Search / examination 42
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2010 Drawings Search / examination 3
28.04.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
04.05.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43