Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2289461

EP2289461 - Dental superstructure, and a method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
20.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kulzer GmbH
Leipziger Strasse 2
63450 Hanau / DE
[2017/39]
Former [2016/46]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer GmbH
Grüner Weg 11
63450 Hanau / DE
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
Heraeus Kulzer Nordic AB
Box 22237
250 24 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2013/50]For all designated states
Heraeus Dental AB
Box 22237
250 24 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2011/09]For all designated states
Biomain AB
Box 22237
250 24 Helsingborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Benzon, Sture
c/o Biomain AB Box 22237
250 24, Helsingborg / SE
02 / Leike, Per-Olof
Kopparåsvägen 50
427 38, BILLDAL / SE
 [2011/09]
Representative(s)Ström & Gulliksson AB
P O Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Ström & Gulliksson AB
Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date10161786.822.08.2007
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateSE2006000175425.08.2006         Original published format: SE 0601754
US20070919041P20.03.2007         Original published format: US 919041 P
[2011/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2289461
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2011/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/09]
TitleGerman:Dentale Suprastruktur und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2011/09]
English:Dental superstructure, and a method of manufacture thereof[2011/09]
French:Superstructure dentaire et son procédé de fabrication[2011/09]
Examination procedure02.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/41]
30.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination17.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1112/17
19.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/47]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07794175.5  / EP2053985
Divisional application(s)EP14198555.6  / EP2901963
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070794175) is  23.11.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
20.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
22.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]US5015186  (DETSCH STEVEN G [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 14; figures 8, 18-20 * * column 13, lines 24-68 * * column 15, lines 1-12 *;
 [XI]US5116225  (RIERA JUAN C A [UY]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 33; figure 2 * [I] 4;
 [XA]WO0170127  (NOBEL BIOCARE AB [SE], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, lines 14-39; figures 2d-h * * page 8, lines 1-33 * [A] 2-5
by applicantSE506850
 US6848908
 US5947733
 SE509437