Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2251680 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2251680



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 900
03.09.2020 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
03.09.2020 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
28.08.2020 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
25.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.08.2020 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
25.08.2020 French translation of claims Opposition 2
25.08.2020 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
25.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.07.2020 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 27
17.07.2020 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
17.07.2020 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 23
14.07.2020 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
01.07.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.06.2020 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.06.2020 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 23
22.06.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
22.06.2020 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
19.03.2020 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
19.03.2020 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.03.2020 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.03.2020 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
19.03.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.03.2020 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.03.2020 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 6
12.03.2020 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.03.2020 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
09.03.2020 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
03.03.2020 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 2
17.02.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2020 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
10.02.2020 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
10.02.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
10.02.2020 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
10.01.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
10.01.2020 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
30.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.12.2019 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 24
30.12.2019 Claims Appeal 24
30.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.12.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
10.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 17
10.12.2019 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 17
05.12.2019 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
05.12.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.12.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
03.12.2019 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
15.11.2019 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.11.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.11.2019 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.10.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.10.2019 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
07.10.2019 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.09.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
15.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.11.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.11.2017 Claims Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.11.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 17
08.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.11.2017 Reply to appeal Appeal 8
29.06.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.06.2017 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
23.06.2017 Claims Appeal 2
23.06.2017 Description Appeal 19
23.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.06.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 29
14.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.06.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 10
14.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.06.2017 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
02.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
02.05.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.04.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
21.04.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
21.04.2017 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.04.2017 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
13.04.2017 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
13.04.2017 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
15.02.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 23
15.02.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 22
15.02.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.02.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
15.02.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
15.02.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.02.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
14.02.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
14.02.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.2016 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.12.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
24.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.11.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.11.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 29
12.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.09.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.09.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.06.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
17.06.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.06.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
18.03.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
20.11.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.11.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
23.10.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
14.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.10.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
14.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.10.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.01.2015 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.12.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.08.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.08.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
20.03.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.03.2014 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.01.2014 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.11.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
04.07.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.10.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
06.08.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
06.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.06.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.06.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
05.06.2012 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
13.02.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.01.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.01.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
06.01.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
19.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.08.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
12.08.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
08.08.2011 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
20.10.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
09.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
09.07.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
07.05.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.05.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
07.05.2010 Description Search / examination 15
07.05.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.2010 Drawings Search / examination 14
07.05.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5