Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2216267

EP2216267 - Plastic valves and methods of using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.09.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silgan Dispensing Systems Corporation
11901 Grandview Road
Grandview, MO 64030 / US
[2017/39]
Former [2017/15]For all designated states
WestRock Dispensing Systems, Inc.
11901 Grandview Road
Grandview, MO 64030 / US
Former [2017/13]For all designated states
Westrock Dispensing Systems, Inc.
11901 Grandview Road
Grandview, MO 64030 / US
Former [2010/32]For all designated states
MeadWestvaco Calmar, Inc.
11901 Grandview Road
Grandview, MO 64030 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wanbaugh, Linn
1312 SW Stonecreek Drive
Blue Springs, MO 64015 / US
02 / Dejong, David
2744 Buchanan Ave
Ogden, UT 84403 / US
 [2010/32]
Representative(s)Coulson, Elizabeth Eve , et al
Coulson & Rule
13 Whitehall Road
Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 3AE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/32]Coulson, Elizabeth Eve , et al
Coulson & Associates 1st Floor Suite 5 Newbold Road Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 2LQ / GB
Application number, filing date10162360.128.08.2008
[2010/32]
Priority number, dateUS20070968365P28.08.2007         Original published format: US 968365 P
US20070980270P16.10.2007         Original published format: US 980270 P
US20080041491P01.04.2008         Original published format: US 41491 P
[2010/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2216267
Date:11.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2216267
Date:16.02.2011
[2011/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/14
[2010/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/32]
TitleGerman:Kunststoffventile und Verfahren zu ihrer Anwendung[2010/32]
English:Plastic valves and methods of using the same[2010/32]
French:Valves en matière plastique et procédés d'utilisation de celles-ci[2010/32]
Examination procedure07.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/32]
21.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.01.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.03.2017Appeal received No.  T1914/17
30.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08829932.6  / EP2183055
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080829932) is  30.06.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2295342  (SENEGAGLIA ROSALBA [IT]) [X] 9-13 * pages 5-10 * * figures 7-15 * [A] 1-8,14-17;
 [A]FR2889171  (SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING SA [FR]) [A] 1-8,14-17 * page 13; figures 1e,1f *;
 [A]US6375046  (ALLEARD JEAN-PIERRE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-8,14-17 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] * * figures 2,3 *