Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2209205

EP2209205 - Method for operating a wind energy system in case of overvoltage in the grid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.02.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senvion GmbH
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
[2015/36]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Senvion SE
Überseering 10 (Oval Office)
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2014/33]For all designated states
REpower Systems SE
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Former [2010/29]For all designated states
REpower Systems AG
Überseering 10
22297 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fortmann, Jens
Kuckhoffstrasse 117b
13156 Berlin / DE
02 / Letas, Heinz-Hermann
Eutiner Landstrasse 23a
23701 Süsel
Groß Meinsdorf / DE
 [2011/08]
Former [2010/29]01 / Fortmann, Jens
Kuckhoffstraße 117b
13156, Berlin / DE
02 / Dr. Letas, Heinz-Hermann
Eutiner Landstr. 23a
23701, Süsel
Groß Meinsdorf / DE
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/12]Seemann, Ralph
Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Former [2010/29]Seemann, Ralph
Seemann & Partner, Ballindamm 3
20095 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10162409.621.02.2008
[2010/29]
Priority number, dateDE2007101787013.04.2007         Original published format: DE102007017870
[2010/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2209205
Date:21.07.2010
Language:DE
[2010/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2209205
Date:21.03.2012
Language:DE
[2012/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:H02P9/00, F03D7/02, F03D9/00, H02J3/18, H02J3/38, H02J9/06, H02P9/10
[2010/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/29]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Windenergieanlage bei Überspannungen im Netz[2010/29]
English:Method for operating a wind energy system in case of overvoltage in the grid[2010/29]
French:Procédé pour faire fonctionner une centrale éolienne en cas de surtensions dans le réseau[2010/29]
Examination procedure10.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/29]
13.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2012Fee for grant paid
04.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08715905.9  / EP2135349
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080715905) is  21.01.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012  18.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 04  21.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012  18.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
 04  21.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2015/18]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012  18.03.2015  WITHDRAWN
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang
Samson & Partner
Patentanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 04  21.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
 03  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang
Samson & Partner
Patentanwälte
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 04  21.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2013/12]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Fritsch, Stephan
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  20.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 04  21.12.2012  29.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2013/07]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012   
Siemens AG
CT IP Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
80200 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012   
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  20.12.2012   
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Opponent's representative
Lippich, Wolfgang
Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
 04  21.12.2012   
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2013/05]
Opponent(s)01  18.12.2012   
Siemens AG
CT IP Otto-Hahn-Ring 6
80200 München / DE
 02  20.12.2012   
Nordex Energy GmbH
Langenhorner Chaussee 600
22419 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schildberg, Peter
Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
05.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.06.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.02.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.04.2017Appeal received No.  T0935/17
01.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
03.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.02.2008
CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
AT21.02.2013
IE21.02.2013
LU21.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
TR21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
AT21.02.2013
IE21.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
MT21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
AT21.02.2013
IE21.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/24]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
AT21.02.2013
IE21.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
IE21.02.2013
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/06]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
BE28.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/48]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/33]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
IT21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NL21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
BG21.06.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2013/01]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
PT23.07.2012
Former [2012/50]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
SK21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
Former [2012/49]CY21.03.2012
CZ21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
PL21.03.2012
RO21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
SI21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
IS21.07.2012
Former [2012/48]CY21.03.2012
EE21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
SE21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY21.03.2012
FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
LV21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI21.03.2012
HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR21.03.2012
LT21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
GR22.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT21.03.2012
NO21.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007052244  (HUDSON RAYMOND M [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0042] , [0053] , [0062] , [0070] - [0072]; figures 1,4 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [Y]EP1752660  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0010]; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]WO0125630  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO2006120033  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1,9 * figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US2005090937  (MOORE GARY [CA], et al) [Y] 1,9 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE102004048339
 EP1386078