blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2251488

EP2251488 - Tamper for soil compaction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ammann Verdichtung GmbH
Josef-Dietzgen-Strasse 36
53773 Hennef / DE
[2010/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Pütz, Mark
Dickstraße 99
53773, Hennef Sieg / DE
 [2015/46]
Former [2010/46]01 / Pütz, Mark
Dickstraße 99
53773, Hennef Sieg / DE
Representative(s)Bauer, Dirk
Bauer Wagner Pellengahr Sroka
Patent- & Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB
Grüner Weg 1
52070 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/46]Bauer, Dirk
BAUER WAGNER PRIESMEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grüner Weg 1
52070 Aachen / DE
Former [2010/46]Bauer, Dirk
BAUER WAGNER PRIESMEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grüner Weg 1
52070 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date10162811.314.05.2010
[2010/46]
Priority number, dateDE2009100311314.05.2009         Original published format: DE102009003113
[2010/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2251488
Date:17.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2251488
Date:26.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2251488
Date:11.11.2015
Language:DE
[2015/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2012
ClassificationIPC:E02D3/068
[2010/46]
CPC:
E02D3/068 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/46]
Former [2010/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stampfgerät zur Bodenverdichtung[2010/46]
English:Tamper for soil compaction[2010/46]
French:Pilon pour compactage du sol[2010/46]
Examination procedure04.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/02]
12.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2015Fee for grant paid
23.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2015
Opposition(s)12.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.05.2010
AL11.11.2015
BG11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
MT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU14.05.2010
BG11.11.2015
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
MT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2018/32]HU14.05.2010
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
MT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2018/29]HU14.05.2010
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
TR11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU14.05.2010
CY11.11.2015
CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
MC11.11.2015
MK11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2017/38]CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2017/04]CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
LU14.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SI11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ11.11.2015
DK11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
SM11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ11.11.2015
EE11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
RO11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
SK11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ11.11.2015
ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/25]ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
LV11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/24]ES11.11.2015
FI11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
PL11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
GR12.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
PT11.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES11.11.2015
HR11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
SE11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NL11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
IS11.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES11.11.2015
IT11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
NO11.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES11.11.2015
LT11.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19739743  (WACKER WERKE KG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,9,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2004165953  (GREPPMAIR MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,9,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4104001  (UEBEL PHILIP) [X] 1-3,7,9,11 * the whole document *
by applicantEP1012403
 EP1010403
 DE1925870
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.