Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2366321

EP2366321 - Vacuum cleaner filter bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.01.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eurofilters Holding N.V.
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
[2011/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Sauer, Ralf
c/o Eurofilters Holding N.V.,
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
02 / Schultink, Jan
c/o Eurofilters Holding N.V.
Lieven Gevaertlaan 21
3900 Overpelt / BE
 [2011/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2011/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date10163463.220.05.2010
[2011/38]
Priority number, dateEP2010000296419.03.2010         Original published format: EP 10002964
[2011/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2366321
Date:21.09.2011
Language:DE
[2011/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2366321
Date:05.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:A47L9/14, B01D46/52
[2011/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/38]
TitleGerman:Staubsaugerfilterbeutel[2011/38]
English:Vacuum cleaner filter bag[2011/38]
French:Sac d'aspirateur[2011/38]
Examination procedure20.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2012Examination requested  [2012/18]
24.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2014Fee for grant paid
22.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.12.2014  08.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Wolf PVG GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 15
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2014   
Wolf PVG GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 15
32602 Vlotho-Exter / DE
Opponent's representative
Dantz, Jan Henning, et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
12.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
31.03.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1332/17
10.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.05.2010
AL05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MK05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
AT20.05.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU20.05.2010
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MK05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
AT20.05.2015
Former [2016/36]HU20.05.2010
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
AT20.05.2015
Former [2016/33]HU20.05.2010
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/32]HU20.05.2010
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/28]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/22]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
SM05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2016/16]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/24]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/21]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
IE20.05.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/09]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/08]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/04]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
LU20.05.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/02]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/48]CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/41]CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/37]CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2006025249  (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,17 * figures 1-4b * [I] 5-7;
 [XI]WO0000269  (KOEHLER OTMAR [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,10,17 * figure 27; claims 1-20 * [I] 5,6;
 [XI]JP2001204661  (TOSHIBA TEC KK, et al) [X] 1-4,17 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figure - * [I] 5,6;
 [A]GB879188  (JOSEPH CHADWICK & SONS LTD, et al) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 28 - line 84; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0338479  (GESSNER & CO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * figure 2c *;
 [A]DE4227744  (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE202005021300U  (EUROFILTERS HOLDING NV [BE]) [A] 1,11 * paragraph [0065]; figure 3 *
ExaminationDE20101466U
by applicantUS3596443
 DE20101466U
 EP0161790
 EP0639061
 EP1059056
 EP1661500
 EP1683460
 DE102008006769
 EP0960645
 DE102007060747
 DE202007010692U
 WO2005060807
 WO2010000453
 DE202009002970U
 DE202006016303U
 EP1915938
 DE202008016300U
 DE202008007717U
 DE202006019108U
 DE202006016304U
 EP1787560
 EP1804635
 DE102007060748
 EP1982625
 DE202005010357U
 EP1849392
 DE202008006904U
 DE102004009956
 EP1725153
 US5401446