Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2387977

EP2387977 - Catheter system for introducing an expandable heart valve stent into the body of a patient [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Change - inventorpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
01.02.2019Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JenaValve Technology Inc.
Regus Business Centre Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
[2013/45]
Former [2011/47]For all designated states
JenaValve Technology Inc.
Regus Business Centre Wilmington Downtown 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Straubinger, Helmut
Am Vogelacker 10a
85609 Aschheim / DE
02 / Mayer, Arnulf
Maria Adelberger Str. 25
85570 Markt Schwaben / DE
03 / Jung, Johannes
Im Oberdorf 13a
75181 Pforzheim-Huchenfeld / DE
 [2011/47]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
Former [2011/47]Trinks, Ole
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date10163478.020.05.2010
[2011/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2387977
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2387977
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/95, A61F2/24
[2013/45]
Former International [2011/47]A61F2/84, A61F2/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/47]
TitleGerman:Kathetersystem zur Einführung eines expandierbaren Herzklappenstents in einen Patientenkörper[2011/47]
English:Catheter system for introducing an expandable heart valve stent into the body of a patient[2011/47]
French:Système de cathéter pour introduire une endoprothèse de valvule cardiaque extensible dans le corps d'un patient[2011/47]
Examination procedure28.12.2011Examination requested  [2012/06]
02.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2013
14.05.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2013Fee for grant paid
21.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.08.2014   
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation, Law Department
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
 02  06.08.2014   
N J Akers & Co Limited
63 Lemon Street
Truro
Cornwall TR1 2PN / GB
Opponent's representative
Akers, Noel James
N.J. Akers & Co
63 Lemon Street
Truro, Cornwall TR1 2PN / GB
 [2014/37]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
12.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2015
29.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.04.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition17.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1491/16
17.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
MK21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
BE31.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
SM14.12.2015
BG08.08.2017
[2019/10]
Former [2018/46]AL06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
MK21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
BE31.05.2015
BG31.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
SM14.12.2015
Former [2018/43]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
MT20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
MK21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
BE31.05.2015
BG31.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
SM14.12.2015
Former [2018/40]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
MK21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
BE31.05.2015
BG31.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
MT31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
SM14.12.2015
Former [2017/40]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
TR20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
BE31.05.2015
BG31.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
MT31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
SM14.12.2015
Former [2017/03]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
MT31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/36]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
AT20.05.2015
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
PL20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/35]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
ES21.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/31]CY06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/28]GR07.02.2014
CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
RO20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
NL01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
DK31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/11]CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
SI21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ20.05.2015
FI20.05.2015
HR20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
SK20.05.2015
HU21.05.2015
SE21.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
PT20.11.2015
IS01.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI20.05.2015
IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
LV20.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
EE31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
Former [2016/08]IT20.05.2015
LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
NO31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
Former [2016/07]LT20.05.2015
LU20.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
Former [2016/06]LU20.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
MC01.06.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008147182  (RIGHINI GIOVANNI [IT], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0059] - [0061]; figures 1-2,10A-10D *;
 [Y]US2002045929  (DIAZ JUAN-CARLOS [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; figures 9B,10B *;
 [Y]WO2006089517  (STRECKER ERNST-PETER [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * pages 20-23; figures 28-30 *;
 [Y]WO2008138584  (JENAVALVE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009093876  (NITZAN YACOV [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 3C, 4A, 4B and description thereof *
by applicantWO2004019825
 US4665604
 EP20070110318
 EP20080151963