blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2264275 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2264275



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 429
07.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.12.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
01.12.2016 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
24.11.2016 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
21.11.2016 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
20.10.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.12.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.12.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
08.04.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
08.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.04.2011 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
24.11.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.11.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.10.2010 Annex Search / examination 2
28.10.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
12.08.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2010 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
10.06.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
27.05.2010 Description Search / examination 108
27.05.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Drawings Search / examination 20
27.05.2010 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
27.05.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49