Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2264275
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.11.2016 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
27.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2014 |
Change - filing date |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
12.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.10.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.11.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
19.11.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
31.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|