Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2246068

EP2246068 - Synchronized water and production and use thereof and a device for treatment of tinnitus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Antinitus AB
Nybrogatan 39
114 39 Stockholm / SE
[2017/47]
Former [2011/46]For all designated states
Akloma Tinnitus AB
C/o Akloma BioScience AB
P.O. Box 19098
SE 104 32 Stockholm / SE
Former [2010/44]For all designated states
Akloma Bioscience AB
Medeon Science Park Per Albin Hanssons väg 41
205 12 Malmö / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Johansson, Benny
Poppelgatan 39
213 62, Malmö / SE
 [2010/44]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [2010/44]Henriksson, Dan Ragnar Mikael
Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date10164290.813.02.2008
[2010/44]
Priority number, dateSE2007000037213.02.2007         Original published format: SE 0700372
US20070900971P13.02.2007         Original published format: US 900971 P
[2010/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2246068
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K41/00, C02F1/00
[2010/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/44]
TitleGerman:Synchronisiertes Wasser und Herstellung und Verwendung davon und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Tinnitus[2010/44]
English:Synchronized water and production and use thereof and a device for treatment of tinnitus[2010/44]
French:Production et utilisation synchronisée d'eau et dispositif pour le traitement de tintements[2010/44]
Examination procedure02.05.2011Examination requested  [2011/24]
07.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination03.07.2015Appeal received No.  T2094/15
04.09.2015Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08712711.4  / EP2125625
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080712711) is  20.03.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
18.01.2013Request for further processing filed
18.01.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.02.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
23.08.2011Request for further processing filed
23.08.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
06.09.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
03.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
17.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - Simonne Rivière, "L'église de Saint-Sulpice de Favières, un harmonieux témoignage du XIIIème siècle", (19911231), URL: http://syndicat.chez-alice.fr/eglisesaint-sulpicedefavieres.htm, (20100809), XP002595791 [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [I] 7,10-14
 [XI]  - Olivier Perrin, "Eglise Saint-Sulpice de Favières", (19000101), URL: http://perrin.olivier.free.fr/evry/Eglise%20Saint%20Sulpice%20des%20favieres/index.html, (20100809), XP002596655 [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [I] 7,10-14
 [XI]  - ANONYMOUS, "Flower of life pendant - silver", (20070103), Ka Gold Jewelry, URL: http://www.ka-gold-jewelry.com/p-products/flower-of-life-silver.php, (20100810), XP002596024 [X] 1,9,10 * pages 2,58 * [I] 2-8,11-15
 [A]  - A. CATENACCIO, Y. DARUICH, C. MAGALLANES, "Temperature dependence of the permittivity of water", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, (20031231), vol. 367, pages 669 - 671, XP002595372 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0009-2614(02)01735-9
 [A]  - GEORGE S. KELL, "Density, Thermal Expansivity, and Compressibility of Liquid Water from 0° to 150°C: Correlations and Tables for Atmospheric Pressure and Saturation Reviewed and Expressed on 1968 Temperature Scale", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA, (19751231), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 97 - 105, XP002595373 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/je60064a005
 [T]  - ANONYMOUS, "Properties of water", (20100803), Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Properties_of_water, (20100804), XP002595374 [T] 1 * the whole document *
 [T]  - Martin Chaplin, "Water Absorption Spectrum", (20100111), URL: http://www1.lsbu.ac.uk/water/vibrat.html, (20100805), XP002595375 [T] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicant   - CHO CHSINGH SROBINSON GW, "Liquid water and biological systems: the problem in science that hardly anyone wants to be solved", FARADAY DISCUSS, (1996), vol. 103, pages 19 - 27
    - CHAPLIN MF, "A proposal for the structuring of water", BIOPHYS CHEM, (2000), vol. 83, pages 211 - 221
    - AUERBACH D, "Supercooling and the Mpemba effect; when hot water freezes quicker than cold water", AM J PHYS, (1995), vol. 63, pages 882 - 885
    - SPEEDY RJ, "Waterlike anomalies from repulsive interactions", J CHEM PHYSICS, (1997), vol. 107, pages 3222 - 3229
    - LIU KCRUZAN DSAYKALLY RJ, "Water clusters", SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 271, pages 929 - 933
    - TSAI CJJORDAN KD, "Theoretical study of small water clusters", J. PHYS. CHEM., (1993), vol. 97, pages 5208 - 5210
    - WATTERSON JG, "The pressure pixel: unit of life", BIOSYSTEMS, (1997), vol. 41, pages 141 - 152
    - LO SYLI WCHUANG SH, "Water clusters in life", MED HYPOTH, (2000), vol. 54, pages 948 - 953
    - VEDAMUTHU MSINGH SROBINSON GW, "Properties of liquid water: origin of the density anomalies", J. PHYS. CHEM., (1994), vol. 98, pages 2222 - 2230
    - CHO CHSINGH SROBINSON GW, "Understanding of all water's anomalies with a non-local potential", J. CHEM. PHYS., (1997), vol. 107, pages 7979 - 7988
    - ROBINSON GWCHO CH, "Role of hydration water in protein unfolding", BIOPHYS. J., (1999), vol. 77, pages 3311 - 3318
    - GRAZIANO G, "On the size dependence of hydrophobic hydration", J. CHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 94, pages 3345 - 3352
    - STEEL EAMERZ KMSELINGER ACASTLEMAN AW, "Mass-spectral and computational free-energy studies of alkali-metal ion-containing water clusters", J. PHYS. CHEM., (1995), vol. 99, pages 7829 - 7836
    - WATTERSON JG, "The interactions of water and protein in cellular function", PROG. MOL. SUBCELL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 12, pages 113 - 134
    - RAND RPPARSEGIAN VA, "Hydration force between phospholipid bilayers", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1989), vol. 988, pages 351 - 376
    - WIGGINS PM, "Enzymes and two state of water", J. BIOL PHYS. CHEM., (2002), vol. 2, pages 25 - 37
    - WOUTERSEN, S.BAKER, H. J., "Resonant intermolecular transfer of vibrational energy in liquid water", NATURE, (1999), vol. 402, pages 507 - 509
    - W. E. DIBBLEW. A. TILLER, "Development of pH and temperature and oscillations in water containg ZnC03 crystallites using intention imprinted electronic devices", SUBTLE ENERGIES & ENERGY MEDICINE, (1997), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 175 - 193
    - HANSTORP D., "Jakten pa absoluta nollpunkten", CHALMERS MAGASIN, (2001), vol. 3, pages 38 - 39
    - GIDDY APDOVE MTPAWLEY GSHEINE V, "The determination of rigid unit modes as potential soft modes for displace phase transitions in framework crystal structures", ACTA CRYTALLOGRAPH, (1993), vol. A49, pages 697 - 703
    - HAMMONDS KDDOVE MTGIDDY APHEINE V, "Crush: a fortran program for the analysis of rigid unit mode spectrum of framework structure", AM MINERALOG, (1994), vol. 79, pages 1207 - 1209
    - KLEIN RA, "Ab Initio Calculations of 17 0 NMR-chemical shifts for water. The limits of PCM theory and the role of hydrogen-bond geometry and cooperativity", J PHYS CHEM A, (2004), vol. 108, pages 5851 - 5863
    - KOROTKOV KKOROTKIN A., "Concentration dependence of gas discharge around drops of inorganic electrolytes", J APPL PHYSICS, (2001), vol. 89, pages 4732 - 4739
    - AGLADZE KIKRINSKY VI, "Multi-armed vortices in an active chemical medium", NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, pages 424 - 426
    - PINTO V, THE RELATIVE HYDROGEN SCORE, URL: www.h-minus- ion.org/rH-score-1.html
    - DIPLOCK ATAGGRET PJ, "Scientific concepts of functional foods in Europe. Consensus document", BR J NUTR, (1999), vol. 81, no. 1, pages S1 - S27
    - EASTERBROOK JA, "The effect of emotion on cue utilization and the organisation of behavior", PSYCHOL REVIEW, (1959), vol. 66, pages 183 - 201
    - LIU KCRUZAN DSAYKALLY RJ, "Water clusteras", SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 271, pages 929 - 933
    - TSAI CJJORDAN KD, "Theoretical study of small water clusters", J PHYS CHEM, (1993), vol. 97, pages 5208 - 5210
    - LO SYLI WCHUANG SH, "Water clusters in life", MED HYPOTHESIS, (2000), vol. 54, pages 948 - 53
    - TESCHKE ODE SOUZA EF, "Water molecule clusters measured at water/air interfaces using atomic force microscopy", PHYS CHEM CHEM PHYS, (2005), vol. 7, pages 3856 - 3865
    - BULIENKOV NA, "The role of system-forming modular water structures in self- organization of biological systems", J MOLEC LIQUIDS, (2003), vol. 106, pages 257 - 275
    - HIGASHITANI, K.KAGE, A.KATAMURA, S.IMAI, K.HATADE, S., "Effects of a magnetic field on the formation of CaC03 particles", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 156, pages 90 - 95
    - KNEY, A.D.PARSONS, S.A., "A spectrophotometer-based study of magnetic water treatment: Assessment of ionic vs. surface mechanisms", WATER RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 40, pages 517 - 524
    - TILLER WADIBBLE WENUNLEY RSHEALEY CN, "Toward experimentation and discovery in conditional laboratoty spaces: Part 1. Experimental pH change findings at some remote sites", J ALTERN COMPL MED, (2004), vol. 10, pages 145 - 157
    - TILLER WADIBBLE WENUNLEY RSHEALEY CN, "Toward experimentation and discovery in conditional laboratoty spaces: Part II. pH change experience at four remote sites", J ALTERN COMPL MED, (2004), vol. 10, pages 301 - 306