Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2263938

EP2263938 - Cooling device for effusion or transpiration cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V.
Linder Höhe
51147 Köln / DE
[2010/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Kuhn, Markus
Paracelsusstraße 72
70771, Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
02 / Elsässer, Henning
Im Haldenhau 20
70565, Stuttgart / DE
 [2016/37]
Former [2016/30]01 / Kuhn, Markus
Paracelsusstraße 72
70711, Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
02 / Elsässer, Henning
Im Haldenhau 20
70565, Stuttgart / DE
Former [2010/51]01 / Kuhn, Markus
Paracelsusstraße 72
70711, Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
02 / Elsässer, Henning
Im Haldenhau 20
70565, Stuttgart / DE
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/30]
Former [2010/51]Boehme, Ulrich , et al
HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date10165190.908.06.2010
[2010/51]
Priority number, dateDE2009102545715.06.2009         Original published format: DE102009025457
[2010/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2263938
Date:22.12.2010
Language:DE
[2010/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2263938
Date:26.03.2014
Language:DE
[2014/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2263938
Date:27.07.2016
Language:DE
[2016/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:B64G1/58, F02K9/64, F01D5/18
[2014/13]
Former International [2010/51]B64G1/58
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/30]
Former [2010/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kühlvorrichtung für eine Effusions- oder Transpirationskühlung[2010/51]
English:Cooling device for effusion or transpiration cooling[2010/51]
French:Dispositif de refroidissement pour un refroidissement par effusion ou par transpiration[2010/51]
Examination procedure25.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/45]
09.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2016Fee for grant paid
20.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.02.2016
Opposition(s)02.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
07.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.06.2010
AL27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MK27.07.2016
MT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU08.06.2010
AL27.07.2016
CY27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2019/31]HU08.06.2010
AL27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2018/46]AL27.07.2016
CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2018/43]CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
MT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2018/11]CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
MC27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SI27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/31]CZ27.07.2016
DK27.07.2016
EE27.07.2016
ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
RO27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
SK27.07.2016
SM27.07.2016
BG27.10.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/13]ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
LV27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/11]ES27.07.2016
FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
GR28.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
PT28.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI27.07.2016
HR27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
PL27.07.2016
SE27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
IS27.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI27.07.2016
IT27.07.2016
LT27.07.2016
NL27.07.2016
NO27.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT27.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5363645  (PELLET MARC [FR]) [X] 1,2,11,12,15 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 11 * * column 7, line 8 - line 15; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-7,14 [I] 3,4,8,9;
 [XI]DE19901424  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,8,11-13,15 * column 1, line 27 - line 47; figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 37 - line 42 * * column 2, line 57 - line 68 * * column 3, line 10 - line 24 * [I] 2,9;
 [XI]GB778672  (PARSONS & MARINE ENG TURBINE) [X] 1,4 * page 1, line 48 - line 61 * * page 2, line 14 - line 18 * * page 2, line 32 - line 34 * * page 2, line 80 - line 112; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,3;
 [X]DE1273907  (BOELKOW GMBH) [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 38; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]DE19730674  (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [Y] 5-7 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 33 * * column 18, line 8 - line 49; figures 1,8,11,12 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US4840025  (COFFINBERRY GEORGE A [US]) [Y] 14 * column 10, line 28 - line 44 * * column 11, line 14 - line 40; figures 4-6 * [A] 1
by applicantUS7281688