Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2395461

EP2395461 - System for optimising delivery or collection journeys [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Post AG
Charles-de-Gaulle-Strasse 20
53113 Bonn / DE
[2011/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Paul, Boris
Clemens-August-Str. 47
53115 Bonn / DE
02 / Wild, Verena
Burbacher Str. 53
53129 Bonn / DE
03 / Schulte-Hillen, Thomas
Schweinheimerweg 4
53177 Bonn / DE
04 / Ulrich, Keith, Dr.
Kinkelstrasse 14
53227 Bonn-Oberkassel / DE
 [2011/50]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter
Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51
52074 Aachen / DE
Application number, filing date10165227.908.06.2010
[2011/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2395461
Date:14.12.2011
Language:DE
[2011/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G01C21/36
[2011/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:System zur Optimierung von Abhol- und/oder Lieferfahrten[2011/50]
English:System for optimising delivery or collection journeys[2011/50]
French:Système d'optimisation des trajets de réception et/ou de livraison[2011/50]
Examination procedure06.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/31]
22.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
02.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination17.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0692/17
07.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP17203839.0  / EP3324350
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.08.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2010006726  (DEUTSCHE POST AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3 - page 22 *;
 [I]WO2009080066  (TOM TOM INT BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 5-9 * * page 20 *;
 [AD]US2002165729  (KUEBERT EDWARD J [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] *
by applicantUS7647231