Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2248495

EP2248495 - A disposable absorbent article designed to facilitate an easy intuitive change [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  15.04.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2012/42]
Former [2010/45]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Magee, Luke Robinson
6119 FAIRWAY DRIVE
Cincinnati, OH 45212 / US
02 / Glackin, III, George Bartol
320 PLEASANT HILL DRIVE
Wyoming, OH 45215 / US
03 / Thurnay, Eva Susanne Dominique
Seebachstr. 21
65929, Frankfurt/Main / DE
04 / Schmidt, Mattias
Sulzbacher Str. 30-40
65824, Schwalbach / DE
05 / Mueller, Joerg
Sulzbacher Str. 30 - 40
65824, Schwalbach / DE
06 / Roe, Donald Carroll
6324 EMBERWOOD COURT
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
07 / Kline, Mark James
6318 ALERT NEW LONDON ROAD
OKEANA, OH 45053 / US
08 / Hosmer, Christopher John
1220 Washington Street
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
09 / Korn-Gold, Naomi Shoshana
1220 Washington St
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
10 / Wilson, James Anthony
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
11 / Bates, Mark Christopher
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
12 / Jewell, Kenneth Edwin
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
13 / Costello, John Carl
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
14 / Sullivan, Ann Marie
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
15 / Flender, Gregg Allen
1220 Washington St
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
 [2012/42]
Former [2010/45]01 / Magee, Luke Robinson
6119 FAIRWAY DRIVE
Cincinnati, OH 45212 / US
02 / Glackin, III, George Bartol
320 PLEASANT HILL DRIVE
Wyoming, OH 45215 / US
03 / Thurnay, Eva Susanne Dominique
Seebachstr. 21
65929, Frankfurt/Main / DE
04 / Schmidt, Mattias
Sulzbacher Str. 30-40
65824, Schwalbach / DE
05 / Mueller, Joerg
Sulzbacher Str. 30 - 40
65824, Schwalbach / DE
06 / Roe, Donald Carroll
6324 EMBERWOOD COURT
West Chester, OH 45069 / US
07 / Kline, Mark James
6318 ALERT NEW LONDON ROAD
OKEANA, OH 45053 / US
08 / Hosmer, Christopher John
1220 Washington Street
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
09 / Korn-Gold, Naomi Shoshana
1220 Washington St
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
10 / Wilson, James Anthony
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
11 / Bates, Mark Christopher
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
12 / Jewell, Kenneth Edwin
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
13 / Costello, John Carl
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
14 / Sullivan, Ann Marie
1220 Washington St.
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
15 / Flender, Gregg Allen
1220 Washington St
West Newton, MA 02465 / US
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London
EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2012/42]McGregor, Judit Ester
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2010/45]McGregor, Judit Ester
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date10165230.315.02.2003
[2010/45]
Priority number, dateUS2002007918420.02.2002         Original published format: US 79184
[2010/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2248495
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2248495
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2010/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/45]
TitleGerman:Zur Unterstützung eines leichten intuitiven Wechsels konzipierter absorbierender Einwegartikel[2010/45]
English:A disposable absorbent article designed to facilitate an easy intuitive change[2010/45]
French:Article absorbant jetable conçu pour faciliter un changement intuitif facile[2010/45]
Examination procedure07.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/21]
08.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2012Fee for grant paid
27.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03713523.3  / EP1476111
EP06125384.5  / EP1854441
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030713523) is  02.02.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.06.2013  05.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  15.07.2013  15.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB, et al
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/37]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2013  05.07.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  15.07.2013   
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB, et al
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2013/32]
Opponent(s)01  26.06.2013   
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert, et al
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
26.08.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.02.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.07.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2015
17.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.03.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/40]
18.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
22.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 08
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 09
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2003
AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IE15.02.2013
LU15.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2014/07]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
IE15.02.2013
PT18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/52]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CY17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/48]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/35]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
CZ17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
EE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
SK17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
DK17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
BG17.01.2013
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/31]AT17.10.2012
BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/28]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
PT18.02.2013
Former [2013/26]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
SI17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
Former [2013/24]BE17.10.2012
FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
GR18.01.2013
Former [2013/22]FI17.10.2012
SE17.10.2012
Former [2013/21]SE17.10.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0035401  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 26; figures 1,2,3 * * page 20, line 24 - page 23, line 16 *
by applicantEP1117671
 US3860003
 US5151092
 US5221274
 US5554145
 US5569234
 US5580411
 US6004306
 US4892536
 US4990147
 US5037416
 US5269775
 EP1117670
 EP1117669
 US4857067
 US4381781
 US4938753
 US5669897
 US4107364
 US4834741
 US5167897
 US5702382
 US5518801
 US5650214
 US5904673
 US6251097