Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2395404

EP2395404 - Secure clock synchronization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - applicantpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2019/35]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Kirrmann, Hubert
Im Rüteli 17
CH-5405, Dättwil / CH
02 / Tournier, Jean-Charles
10, rue Brillat Savarin
F-01200, Bellegarde sur Valserine / FR
 [2011/50]
Representative(s)ABB Patent Attorneys
c/o ABB Schweiz AG
Intellectual Property CH-IP
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2014/24]
Former [2011/50]Meier Obertüfer, Jürg
ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-IC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date10165325.109.06.2010
[2011/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2395404
Date:14.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2395404
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2013/08]
Former International [2011/50]G04G7/00, H04L12/42
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/50]
TitleGerman:Sichere Taktsynchronisierung[2011/50]
English:Secure clock synchronization[2011/50]
French:Synchronisation d'horloge sécurisée[2011/50]
Examination procedure24.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/01]
07.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2013Fee for grant paid
26.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/41]
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014  12.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  05.02.2014   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Michau, Sascha
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
18.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
10.05.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.05.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1875/16
06.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.06.2010
AL08.05.2013
AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
LU09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU09.06.2010
AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
LU09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/32]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MK08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
TR08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
SM08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/20]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
CH30.06.2014
LI30.06.2014
Former [2015/13]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
MT08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
IE09.06.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/14]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
MC08.05.2013
NL08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
IT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
RO08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
CZ08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
SK08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
DK08.05.2013
EE08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT08.05.2013
BE08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2014/02]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
LV08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT08.05.2013
CY08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/51]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
HR08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
PL08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
BG08.08.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT08.05.2013
FI08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
SI08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
GR09.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT08.05.2013
LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
IS08.09.2013
PT09.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT08.05.2013
NO08.08.2013
PT09.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009185501  (HUANG WEIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US2009204811  (FRIES STEFFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0022] *
 [AD]  - ALBERT TREYTL ET AL, "Practical application of 1588 security", PRECISION CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION FOR MEASUREMENT, CONTROL AND COMMUNICATION, 2008. ISPCS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080922), ISBN 978-1-4244-2274-6, pages 37 - 43, XP031354120 [AD] 1-8 * columns 11,12 *
 [A]  - J-C TOURNIER ET AL, "Strategies to secure the IEEE 1588 protocol in digital substation automation", CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURES, 2009. CRIS 2009. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090327), ISBN 978-1-4244-4636-0, pages 1 - 8, XP031472841 [A] 1-8 * columns 11,12 *
by applicantEP2148473