EP2395404 - Secure clock synchronization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/22] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirrmann, Hubert Im Rüteli 17 CH-5405, Dättwil / CH | 02 /
Tournier, Jean-Charles 10, rue Brillat Savarin F-01200, Bellegarde sur Valserine / FR | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2021/08] |
Former [2014/24] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2011/50] | Meier Obertüfer, Jürg ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-IC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 10165325.1 | 09.06.2010 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2395404 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2395404 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2395404 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
G04G7/00 (EP,US);
H04L7/0008 (US);
H04J3/067 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04J3/0664 (EP,US);
H04L9/3242 (EP,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | G04G7/00, H04L12/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sichere Taktsynchronisierung | [2011/50] | English: | Secure clock synchronization | [2011/50] | French: | Synchronisation d'horloge sécurisée | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 07.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2014
12.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/41] |
Former [2015/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2014
12.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2014
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Michau, Sascha Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 18.03.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.07.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.07.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.12.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 08.08.2016 | Appeal received No. T1875/16 | 06.10.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.07.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 28.07.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2010 | AL | 08.05.2013 | AT | 08.05.2013 | BE | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | CZ | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | IT | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | NL | 08.05.2013 | PL | 08.05.2013 | RO | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SK | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | IE | 09.06.2013 | LU | 09.06.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 09.06.2010 | |
AT | 08.05.2013 | ||
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
LU | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MK | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
NL | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
IT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
RO | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SK | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
BE | 08.05.2013 | ||
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
PL | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009185501 (HUANG WEIDA [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2009204811 (FRIES STEFFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0022] * | [AD] - ALBERT TREYTL ET AL, "Practical application of 1588 security", PRECISION CLOCK SYNCHRONIZATION FOR MEASUREMENT, CONTROL AND COMMUNICATION, 2008. ISPCS 2008. IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080922), ISBN 978-1-4244-2274-6, pages 37 - 43, XP031354120 [AD] 1-8 * columns 11,12 * | [A] - J-C TOURNIER ET AL, "Strategies to secure the IEEE 1588 protocol in digital substation automation", CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURES, 2009. CRIS 2009. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090327), ISBN 978-1-4244-4636-0, pages 1 - 8, XP031472841 [A] 1-8 * columns 11,12 * | by applicant | EP2148473 | Opposition | DE102005025325 |