Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2397221

EP2397221 - Control system for a gas phase reactor, a gas phase reactor for catalytic production of polyolefines, a method for catalytic productions of polyolefines and a use of the control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis AG
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
[2011/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Martin, Sanna
Sormuspolku 6 A 2
00950, Helsinki / FI
02 / Elovainio, Erno
Kirjokalliontie 3 D
00430, Helsinki / FI
03 / Zitting, Samuli
Vanamonkuja 7
04300, Tuusula / FI
 [2011/51]
Representative(s)Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[2017/15]
Former [2011/51]Gross, Felix
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date10166314.417.06.2010
[2011/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2397221
Date:21.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2397221
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:B01J8/24, B01J8/38, C08F10/00
[2011/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2011/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuerungssystem für einen Gasphasenreaktor, Gasphasenreaktor für katalytische Herstellung von Polyolefinen, Verfahren zur katalytischen Herstellung von Polyolefinen und zur Verwendung des Steuerungssystems[2016/48]
English:Control system for a gas phase reactor, a gas phase reactor for catalytic production of polyolefines, a method for catalytic productions of polyolefines and a use of the control system[2011/51]
French:Système de contrôle pour réacteur à phase gazeuse, réacteur à phase gazeuse pour la production catalytique de polyoléfines, procédé de production catalytique de polyoléfines et utilisation du système de contrôle[2011/51]
Former [2011/51]Steuerungssystem für ein Gasphasenreaktor, Gasphasenreaktor für katalytische Herstellung von Polyolefinen, Verfahren zur katalytischen Herstellung von Polyolefinen und zur Verwendung des Steuerungssystems
Examination procedure22.05.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2012Examination requested  [2012/30]
21.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2017Fee for grant paid
24.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.09.2012
Opposition(s)15.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.06.2010
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
MK12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU17.06.2010
AT12.04.2017
CY12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2019/31]HU17.06.2010
AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
MT17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/23]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SI12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
IE17.06.2017
LU17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
LU17.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
SM12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT12.04.2017
CZ12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
MC12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
RO12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
SK12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT12.04.2017
DK12.04.2017
EE12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
LV12.04.2017
PL12.04.2017
SE12.04.2017
BG12.07.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT12.04.2017
FI12.04.2017
HR12.04.2017
LT12.04.2017
NO12.07.2017
GR13.07.2017
IS12.08.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]CH690492  (GLATT MASCHINEN & APPARATEBAU [CH]) [X] 1-11 * figure 2; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US3544540  (HOUSER CLARENCE G, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 2, lines 32-35 * * column 6, lines 35-45; figure 2 *;
 [X]US3275809  (TOLIN ERNEST D, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 4, lines 16-17; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 8-21; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0432555  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 6, lines 3-24 * * page 7, lines 1-7,28-29; figure 1n *
by applicantEP0233787
 EP1106629
 US4933149
 EP0684871
 WO2005087361
 US4578879
 EP0600414
 EP0721798
 WO2007025640
 US4543399
 EP0699213
 WO9425495
 EP0696293
 WO0105845
 EP0499759
 EP1415999
 WO0026258
 WO0029452
 US4621952
 EP0188125
 EP0250169
 EP0579426
 US5026795
 US4803251
 US4532311
 US4855370
 EP0560035
 EP0707513
 US4582816
 US3405109
 US3324093
 EP0479186
 US5391654
 US3374211
 US3242150
 EP1310295
 EP0891990
 EP1591460
    - GELDART; BAYENS, DESIGN OF DISTRIBUTORS FOR GAS-FLUIDIZED BEDS, POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 42