Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2242346

EP2242346 - Liquid crystal display device with a heat spreader [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NeoGraf Solutions, LLC
11709 Madison Ave
Lakewood, OH 44107 / US
[2017/52]
Former [2016/35]For all designated states
GrafTech International Holdings Inc.
6100 Oak Tree Boulevard
Independence, Ohio 44131 / US
Former [2010/42]For all designated states
GrafTech International Holdings Inc.
12900 Snow Road
Parma, OH 44130 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clovesko, Timothy
1791 Farr's Garden Path
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
02 / Norley, Julian
17635 Plum Creek Trail
Chagrin Falls, OH 44023/US / US
03 / Smalc, Martin David
5608 Ely Vista Drive
Parma, OH 44129/US / US
04 / Capp, Joseph Paul
10094 Juniper Court
Strongsville, OH 44136/US / US
 [2012/01]
Former [2010/44]01 / Clovesko, Timothy
1791 Farr's Garden Path
Westlake, OH 44145 / US
02 / Norley, Julian
17635 Plum Creek Trail
Chagrin Falls, OH 44023/US / US
03 / Smalc, Martin David
5608 Ely Vista Drive
Parma, OH 44129/US / US
04 / Capp, Joseph Paul
10094 Juniper Court
Strongsville, OH 44136/US / US
Former [2010/42]01 / Clovesko, Timothy
5250 Columbria Road, Apt. 407
North Omsted, OH 44070/US / US
02 / Norley, Julian
17635 Plum Creek Trail
Chagrin Falls, OH 44023/US / US
03 / Smalc, Martin David
5608 Ely Vista Drive
Parma, OH 44129/US / US
04 / Capp, Joseph Paul
10094 Juniper Court
Strongsville, OH 44136/US / US
Representative(s)TL Brand & Co
50 Eastcastle Street
London W1W 8EA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/01]Brand, Thomas Louis
W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2010/42]Brand, Thomas Louis
W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date10166718.624.09.2004
[2010/42]
Priority number, dateUS2003068510314.10.2003         Original published format: US 685103
US2004084453712.05.2004         Original published format: US 844537
US2004089730822.07.2004         Original published format: US 897308
[2010/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2242346
Date:20.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2242346
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, H01J7/24, H01J17/28
[2010/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/42]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristalldisplay mit einem Wärmeabsetzer[2010/42]
English:Liquid crystal display device with a heat spreader[2010/42]
French:Ecran à cristaux liquides avec un dissipateur de chaleur[2010/42]
Examination procedure21.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/42]
30.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2011Fee for grant paid
15.11.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04789001.7  / EP1673754
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040789001) is  15.07.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.10.2012  15.10.2012  ADMISSIBLE
SGL Carbon SE
Rheingaustrasse 182
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Botzenhardt, Sandra
SGL Carbon GmbH
Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18
86405 Meitingen / DE
 [2013/41]
Former [2012/46]
Opponent(s)01  04.10.2012   
SGL Carbon SE
Rheingaustrasse 182
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
Opponent's representative
Sauer, Philippe
Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
08.11.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.05.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1223/16
22.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
21.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
PT04.05.2012
IE24.09.2012
LU24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
FI24.09.2016
SE25.09.2016
[2017/31]
Former [2014/27]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
PT04.05.2012
IE24.09.2012
LU24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2013/33]AT04.01.2012
BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
DK04.01.2012
EE04.01.2012
IT04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
RO04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
SK04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
PT04.05.2012
IE24.09.2012
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
MC30.09.2012
Former [2012/41]BE04.01.2012
CY04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/37]BE04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
PT04.05.2012
Former [2012/36]BE04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
GR05.04.2012
Former [2012/35]BE04.01.2012
NL04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
BG04.04.2012
Former [2012/34]BE04.01.2012
SI04.01.2012
Former [2012/25]SI04.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5831374  (MORITA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [YD] 1-17 * the whole document *;
 [YD]US6482520  (TZENG JING WEN [US]) [YD] 1-4,12-17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2002142165  (NORLEY JULIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3492197  (OLSTOWSKI FRANCISZEK, et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3981427  (BROOKES RONALD R) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2002166658  (NORLEY JULIAN [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2003044614  (NORLEY JULIAN [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,16,17 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6060166  (HOOVER RONALD E [US], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2002157818  (NORLEY JULIAN [US], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6245400  (TZENG JING-WEN [US], et al) [Y] 4-9,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2002163076  (TZENG JIN-WEN [US], et al) [Y] 10-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US6075701  (ALI M AKBAR [US], et al) [Y] 10,12-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2003168882  (SONY CORP) [Y] 12,13,15 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6131651  (RICHEY III JOSEPH B [US]) [Y] 16,17 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6407922  (ECKBLAD MICHAEL Z [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [YP]US2004124772  (CHEN GA-LANE [US]) [YP] 1-17 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5831374
 US6482520
 US3404061
 US4895713