blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2281997

EP2281997 - Split tubular support device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vetco Gray Inc.
4424 West Sam Houston Pkwy North, Suite 100
Houston, TX 77041 / US
[2011/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Maa, Tsorng-Jong
16300 Smith Street
Houston, TX 77040 / US
 [2011/06]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/06]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth
Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date10166737.622.06.2010
[2011/06]
Priority number, dateUS2009049403729.06.2009         Original published format: US 494037
[2011/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2281997
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2281997
Date:12.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2017
ClassificationIPC:E21B19/00, E21B19/10, E21B19/24
[2011/06]
CPC:
E21B19/10 (EP,BR,US); E21B19/002 (EP,BR,US); E21B19/24 (EP,BR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Geteilte Vorrichtung zur Halterung von rohrformigen Leitungen[2011/06]
English:Split tubular support device[2011/06]
French:Dispositif fendu pour le maintien d'un conduit tubulaire[2011/06]
Examination procedure13.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/21]
04.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4199847  (OWENS JAMES H [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *;
 [A]US2007044973  (FRASER THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 36 - page 3, paragraph 41; figure 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.