blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2268096

EP2268096 - BASE STATION, RELAY STATION AND BACKHAUL CONTROL COMMUNICATION METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/52]Base station, relay station and backhaul control communication methods thereof
[2017/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 12.08.2020  [2020/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute for Information Industry
11 Fl. No. 106, Sec. 2
Ho-Ping E. Road
Taipei / TW
[2017/33]
Former [2010/52]For all designated states
Institute for Imformation Industry
11 Fl. No. 106, Sec. 2 Ho-Ping E. Road
Taipei / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Liu, Shu-Tsz
4F No. 2, Aly 14, Ln 251 Futch St.
Taipei / TW
02 / Wu, Chih-Chiang
No. 87, Jhengde Rd., Shalu Township,
Taichung County
Taipei / TW
03 / Loa, Kanchei
2F., No. 57 Alley 7, Lane 397 Mingshuei Rd.
Taipei / TW
04 / Hsu, Chun-Yen
No. 180. Shisijia, Minxiong Township,
Chiayi County
Taipei / TW
 [2017/33]
Former [2010/52]01 / Liu, Shu-Tsz
4F No. 2, Aly 14, Ln 251 Futch St.
Taipei / TW
02 / Wu, Chih-Chiang
No. 87, Jhengde Rd., Shalu Township, Taichung County
Taipei / TW
03 / Loa, Kanchei
2F., No. 57 Alley 7, Lane 397 Mingshuei Rd.
Taipei / TW
04 / Hsu, Chun-Yen
No. 180. Shisijia, Minxiong Township, Chiayi County
Taipei / TW
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Kaistraße 16A
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/33]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2010/52]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte
Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date10167072.723.06.2010
[2010/52]
Priority number, dateUS20090219381P23.06.2009         Original published format: US 219381 P
US20090240694P09.09.2009         Original published format: US 240694 P
US20090242817P16.09.2009         Original published format: US 242817 P
US20090259646P10.11.2009         Original published format: US 259646 P
[2010/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2268096
Date:29.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2268096
Date:30.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2268096
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2012
ClassificationIPC:H04W84/04
[2010/52]
CPC:
H04B7/155 (EP,US); H04W72/543 (US); H04B7/2606 (EP,US);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2010/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BASISSTATION, RELAISSTATION, FUNKBASISSTATION UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN MIT BACKHAUL-STEUERUNG DAFÜR[2017/13]
English:BASE STATION, RELAY STATION AND BACKHAUL CONTROL COMMUNICATION METHODS THEREOF[2017/13]
French:STATION DE BASE, STATION RELAIS ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION DE CONTRÔLE DE RETOUR CORRESPONDANTS[2017/13]
Former [2010/52]Basisstation, Relaisstation, Funkbasisstation und Kommunikationsverfahren mit Backhaul-Steuerung dafür
Former [2010/52]Base station, relay station and backhaul control communication methods thereof
Former [2010/52]Station de base, station relais et procédés de communication de contrôle de retour correspondants
Examination procedure29.11.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/03]
13.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.07.2017Fee for grant paid
01.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.03.2013
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.06.2010
AL16.08.2017
AT16.08.2017
CY16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MK16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
PT16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
TR16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
[2020/33]
Former [2020/31]HU23.06.2010
AT16.08.2017
CY16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
MK16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
PT16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
TR16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2020/30]HU23.06.2010
AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
HR16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
PT16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
TR16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2020/27]HU23.06.2010
AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
PT16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
TR16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2020/16]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
TR16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2019/15]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/39]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2008002702  (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0038] * * figure 3 * [Y] 2,6,10,14;
 [Y]  - MOTOROLA, "Relay Design for LTE-A", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091346 - RELAY DESIGN FOR LTE-A -, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090318), vol. UL, no. Seoul, Korea; 20090318, XP050338941 [Y] 2,6,10,14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [02.2] *
 [Y]  - ERICSSON, "Termination of the S1/X2 interfaces in relay node", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-092953, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090428), no. San Francisco, USA; 20090428, XP050340749 [Y] 2,6,10,14 * paragraph [0002] *
 [A]  - RAPPORTEUR (SAMSUNG), "Miscellaneous corrections and clarifications resulting from ASN.1 review [64_LTE_17]", 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CR0139R2_(REL-8)_R2-091971, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090224), no. Athens, Greece; 20090224, XP050323080 [A] 1-16 * paragraph [5.6.1.1] - paragraph [5.6.1.3] * * paragraph [5.6.2.3] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.