Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2239039

EP2239039 - Air filter arrangement, assembly, and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/41]Air filter arrangement; assembly; and, methods
[2010/42]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.01.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Donaldson Company, Inc.
1400 West 94 Street
Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US
[2010/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Reichter, Gregory L.
10617 Hopkins Road
BLOOMINGTON, MN 55420 / US
02 / Bishop, Wayne R. W.
2709 Salem Avenue South
ST. LOUIS PARK, MN 55416 / US
03 / Nelson, Benny Kevin
3100 Baillif Pl.
BLOOMINGTON, MN 55431 / US
04 / Wegner, Darrel
15021 Butternut Lane
BURNSVILLE, MN 55306 / US
05 / Crenshaw, Bruce R.
6872 East County Road 100 North
FRANKFORT, IN 46041 / US
06 / Kladnitsky, Vladimir
13190 Flamingo Ct.
Apple Vally, Minnesota 55124 / US
07 / Miller, Thomas G.
4748 White Oak Court
EAGAN, MN 55122 / US
08 / Mork, Donald Raymond
2798 Oak Avenue
LIME SPRINGS, IA 52155 / US
09 / Schrage, Kevin J.
18652 Old Cave Road
SPRING VALLEY, MN 55975 / US
10 / Osendorf, Richard J.
211 Edith Drive
ST. PAUL, MN 55118 / US
11 / Kuempel, Bradley A.
18232 Warbler Lane
EDEN PRAIRIE, MN 55346 / US
12 / Lundgren, Thomas John
10213 Scarborough Road
BLOOMINGTON, MN 55437 / US
 [2010/52]
Former [2010/41]01 / Reichter, Gregory L.
10617 Hopkins Road
BLOOMINGTON, MN 55420 / US
02 / Bishop, Wayne R. W.
2709 Salem Avenue South
ST. LOUIS PARK, MN 55416 / US
03 / Nelson, Benny Kevin
3100 Baillif Pl.
BLOOMINGTON, MN 55431 / US
04 / Wegner, Darrel
15021 Butternut Lane
BURNSVILLE, MN 55306 / US
05 / Crenshaw, Bruce R.
6872 East County Road 100 North
FRANKFORT, IN 46041 / US
06 / Kladnitsky, Vladimir
4283 Eagle Crest Drive
EAGAN, MN 55122 / US
07 / Miller, Thomas G.
4748 White Oak Court
EAGAN, MN 55122 / US
08 / Mork, Donald Raymond
2798 Oak Avenue
LIME SPRINGS, IA 52155 / US
09 / Schrage, Kevin J.
18652 Old Cave Road
SPRING VALLEY, MN 55975 / US
10 / Osendorf, Richard J.
211 Edith Drive
ST. PAUL, MN 55118 / US
11 / Kuempel, Bradley A.
18232 Warbler Lane
EDEN PRAIRIE, MN 55346 / US
12 / Lundgren, Thomas John
10213 Scarborough Road
BLOOMINGTON, MN 55437 / US
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/41]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date10167077.605.08.2005
[2010/41]
Priority number, dateUS20040599686P06.08.2004         Original published format: US 599686 P
US20040600081P09.08.2004         Original published format: US 600081 P
US20040602721P18.08.2004         Original published format: US 602721 P
US20040616364P05.10.2004         Original published format: US 616364 P
[2010/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2239039
Date:13.10.2010
Language:EN
[2010/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:B01D46/52, F02M35/024
[2010/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Luftfilteranordnung, Baugruppe und Verfahren[2010/42]
English:Air filter arrangement, assembly, and methods[2010/42]
French:Agencement de filtre à air, ensemble et procédés[2010/41]
Former [2010/41]Luftfilteranordnung, Zusammenbau und Verfahren
Former [2010/41]Air filter arrangement; assembly; and, methods
Examination procedure13.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2011Examination requested  [2011/21]
03.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination26.08.2016Appeal received No.  T0278/17
29.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
14.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05778924.0  / EP1778384
Divisional application(s)EP16178370.9  / EP3135363
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050778924) is  02.07.2008
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[YD]US5820646  (GILLINGHAM GARY R [US], et al) [YD] 1-15 * figures 1,3-6,11,12,17,19,21,24-26 *;
 [Y]US2002157359  (STENERSEN EIVIND [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0066] , [0143]; figures 5-10 *;
 [Y]EP0982062  (TOYODA BOSHOKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-10 *;
 [Y]JPH08243334  (TOYODA SPINNING & WEAVING, et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 5-7 *;
 [Y]WO9916534  (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [Y] 15 * page 70, line 3 - page 70, line 13 *;
 [Y]US5902364  (TOKAR JOSEPH C [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 6-11,13 *;
 [Y]US5472463  (HERMAN PETER K [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 3A, 6,7 *;
 [A]US5759217  (JOY ANTHONY W [US]) [A] 5,6 * figure 5 *
by applicantUS5820646
 US5772883
 US5902364
 US5792247
 US5895574
 US6210469
 US6190432
 US6350296
 US6179890
 US6235195
 USD399944S
 USD428128S
 USD396098S
 USD398046S
 USD437401S
 WO2004007054
 US6039778
 US5613992
 WO9740918
 WO03047722
 US5562825
 US5049326
 US4925561
 US6673136
 US20040543804
 WO2004US07927
 US20040579754
 US20030457255
 US20030731564