Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2399979

EP2399979 - Soluble unit dose articles comprising a cationic polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.03.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2011/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Labeque, Regine
Rue de Lombardzijde 27
1120 Neder-over-Heembeek / BE
02 / Van Ginderen, Peter Jos Emma
Kardinaal Cardijnstraat 61
2630 Aartselaar / BE
03 / Jennewein, Marc
Dietrich Bonhoefferstrasse 6
65232 Taunusstein / DE
 [2011/52]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Belgium UK
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2013/38]Pickford, James Lawrence
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2011/52]Goodier, Claire-Louise
N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date10167234.324.06.2010
[2011/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2399979
Date:28.12.2011
Language:EN
[2011/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2399979
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11D10/04, C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D1/04, C11D3/20
[2011/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/52]
TitleGerman:Lösliche Einmaldosierartikel enthaltend ein kationisches Polymer[2011/52]
English:Soluble unit dose articles comprising a cationic polymer[2011/52]
French:Articles à dose unitaire solubles comprenant un polymère cationique[2011/52]
Examination procedure12.01.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2012Examination requested  [2012/08]
28.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.2014Fee for grant paid
03.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.07.2015  09.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited
103-105 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
Opponent's representative
Cawdell, Karen Teresa
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
 02  15.07.2015  22.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2018/33]
Former [2015/35]
Opponent(s)01  06.07.2015  09.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited
103-105 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowers, Craig Malcolm
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
 02  15.07.2015  22.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/33]
Opponent(s)01  06.07.2015  09.07.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser (Brands) Limited
103-105 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowers, Craig Malcolm
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.03.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition12.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1160/17
19.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.10.2014
AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2017/46]AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2017/38]AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/22]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE24.06.2015
LU24.06.2015
Former [2016/11]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
LU24.06.2015
Former [2016/09]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/24]FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/23]FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT15.10.2014
NL15.10.2014
Former [2015/16]NL15.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1431383  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0178] - [0179]; example -; claim - * [I] 1-9;
 [XI]US2006030513  (BINDER DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0091]; table 27 * [I] 1-5,7-9;
 [XI]WO2007107215  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * pages 9,24-25; example -; claim - * [I] 1-5,7-9;
 [XI]US2008242579  (BRIGGS STEPHEN LEONARD [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * example -; claim - * [I] 1-5,7-9
by applicantUS6787512
 US7135451
 US3929678
 US4565647
 US2658072
 US2438091
 US2528378
 US6579839
 US2009124528
 EP0686691
 WO2009087524
 WO2009087034
 US2003215417
 US2003216488
 US2003158344
 US2003165692
 US2004071742
 US2004071746
 US2004072719
 US2004072720
 EP1393706
 US2003203829
 US2003195133
 US2004087477
 US2004106536
 US6645479
 US6200949
 US4882220
 US4917920
 US4514461
 USRE32713E
 US4234627
 US5942217
 US5968404
 US5955093
 US6106738
 US6033679
 US3915903