EP2317426 - Method for controlling icon display in mobile terminal and mobile terminal thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2011/18] | For all designated states LG Electronics 20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Inyoung 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Jeong, Kyesook 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Choi, Meeyeon 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | 04 /
Jung, Hyunsuk 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | 05 /
Ryu, Eunjeong 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | 06 /
Lee, Byoungnam 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | 07 /
Hong, Jungseok 60-39 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu 153-801, Seoul / KR | [2011/18] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | ter Meer, Nicolaus TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstraße 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10167550.2 | 28.06.2010 | [2011/18] | Priority number, date | KR20090102321 | 27.10.2009 Original published format: KR 20090102321 | [2011/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2317426 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2317426 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1626 (KR);
G06F1/1643 (KR);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F3/04817 (KR);
G06F3/0482 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Symbolanzeige in einem mobilen Endgerät und mobiles Endgerät | [2011/18] | English: | Method for controlling icon display in mobile terminal and mobile terminal thereof | [2011/18] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de l'affichage d'icônes dans un terminal mobile et terminal mobile correspondant | [2011/18] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2010 | Examination requested [2011/18] | 07.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2017 | 13.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/06] | 01.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007013672 (SHIM JUNG-HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 5* paragraphs [0034] - [0037]; figures 2a-3c *; | [I]US2009138823 (BRADEA MARCEL [CA]) [I] 1-4,6,8-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * paragraph [0025]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0028]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0054]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0061] - [0063]; figure 9 *; | [XI] - "T-Mobile G1 User Manual", (20090527), URL: http://support.t-mobile.com/servlet/JiveServlet/previewBody/1747-102-2-2262/G1-User Guide.pdf, (20140321), XP055109239 [X] 1-3,7-13 * section 1.5; page 21 - page 22 * * section 1.7; pages 24-26 * [I] 4-6,14,15 | [A] - Anonymous, "T-Mobile G1 - Full phone specifications", (20091003), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091003192554/http://www.gsmarena.com/t_mobile_g1-2533.php, (20140324), XP055109413 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "T-Mobile G1 review: The whole cagoogle - 01", (20091021), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091021022054/http://www.gsmarena.com/t_mobile_g1-review-337.php, (20140324), XP055109403 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [IA] - Anonymous, "T-Mobile G1 review: The whole cagoogle - 4", (20091020), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091020021711/http://www.gsmarena.com/t_mobile_g1-review-337p4.php, (20140324), XP055109400 [I] 1-3,5-9,11-13,15 * page 2 * [A] 4,10,14 | [IA] - Anonymous, "LG KM900 Arena review: A touch of class - 04", (20090924), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090924103533/http://www.gsmarena.com/lg_km900_arena-review-345p4.php, (20140324), XP055109408 [I] 1-3,6,8,9,11,13,15 * page 2, lines 10-15; figure first * * page 3, lines 1-9; figure first * [A] 4,5,7,10,12,14 | [IA] - GSM Arena, "LG KM900 Arena UI - HD version, part 2", (20090327), URL: http://vimeo.com/3884291, (20140324), XP054975356 [I] 1-3,6,8,9,11,13,15 * 0 to 15 seconds * [A] 4,5,7,10,12,14 | [A] - Anonymous, "LG KM900 Arena - Full phone specifications", (20091002), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20091002085740/http://www.gsmarena.com/lg_km900_arena-2666.php, (20140324), XP055109405 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "LG KM900 Arena review: A touch of class - 01", (20090929), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090929074151/http://www.gsmarena.com/lg_km900_arena-review-345.php, (20140324), XP055109406 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [IA] - David Pogue, "iPhone 3.0: The Missing Manual, 3rd Edition", iPhone 3.0: The Missing Manual, 3rd Edition, O'Reilly Media, Inc., (20090804), ISBN 978-0-59-680429-9, XP055109485 [I] 1,3,5-9,12,13,15 * Chapter 1 - section "The Home Screen"; page 12 - page 14 * [A] 2,4,10,14 | Examination | - Matthew Miller, "A walk around a production T-Mobile G1 Android device", (20081015), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=RmR8g-nVpgc, (20170124), XP055338352 |