Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2404869

EP2404869 - Process for producing ammonia synthesis gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2012
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2013  [2013/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ammonia Casale S.A.
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
[2012/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Filippi, Ermanno
/ Strada di Gandria 73
6976, Castagnola / CH
02 / Baratto, Francesco
/ Via Borgo Vico, 127
22100, Como / IT
03 / Panza, Sergio
/ Viale Varese, 53
22100, Como / IT
04 / Ostuni, Raffaele
/ Via Prampolini, 13
21013, Gallarate (VA) / IT
 [2012/07]
Former [2012/02]01 / Filippi, Ermanno
/ Strada di Gandria 73
6976, Castagnola / CH
02 / Barotto, Francesco
/ Via Borgo Vico, 127
22100, Como / IT
03 / Panza, Sergio
/ Viale Varese, 53
22100, Como / IT
04 / Ostuni, Raffaele
/ Via Prampolini, 13
21013, Gallarate (VA) / IT
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
Application number, filing date10168495.906.07.2010
[2012/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2404869
Date:11.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/02, C01B3/38, C01B3/48, C01B3/50, C01B3/56
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Herstellungsprozess für Ammoniaksynthesegas[2012/02]
English:Process for producing ammonia synthesis gas[2012/02]
French:Procédé de production d'un gaz ammoniac de synthèse[2012/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/01]
20.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP2172417  (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1-3,5,6,8,9 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0016] , [0 18] , [0 19] , [0 22] - [0025] - [0 30] - [0037] * [Y] 3,13;
 [XY]US4296085  (BANQUY DAVID L) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,11,14,15 * abstract * * column 7, lines 57-62; claim 1 * * column 10, lines 18-45 * [Y] 3,13;
 [XY]EP2065337  (AMMONIA CASALE SA [CH]) [X] 7,8 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1,9 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 51] - [0057] - [0064] - [0068] - [0074] * [Y] 3,13;
 [XY]WO0248027  (CONTINENTAL ENGINEERING B V [NL], et al) [X] 7,8 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * claims 1,6,7,9,1012,14,19,20,22 * * page 7, lines 7-24 * * page 10, line 21 - page 12, line 22 * [Y] 3,13;
 [A]US4778670  (PINTO ALWYN [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 6, lines 23-34, 53-60 * * page 7, lines 43-50 * * page 9, lines 40-41 *;
 [A]EP1690826  (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 8,9,15 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0039] , [0053] *
by applicantUS4910007