blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2282416

EP2282416 - Selecting a transmission technology [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vodafone Group PLC
Group Legal (Patents), The Connection Newbury
Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB
For:ES 
Vodafone España, S.A.U.
Avda. de Europa no. 1
28108 Alcobendas / ES
[2011/06]
Inventor(s)01 / De Pasquale, Andrea
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
02 / Exadaktylos, Kyriakos
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
03 / Alcazar Viguera, Esperanza
Area de Tecnologia c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial
28050, Madrid / ES
04 / Diaz Mateos, Maria
Area de Tecnologia c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial
28050, Madrid / ES
05 / Garriga Muñiz, Beatriz
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
06 / Dominguez Romero, Francisco
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
07 / McWilliams, Brendan
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
08 / Urbano Ruiz, Julio
Area de Tecnologia c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial
E-28050, Madrid / ES
09 / Serrano Solsana, Clara
Area de Tecnologia c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
10 / López Roman, Javier
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
11 / García Viñas, Aitor
Area de Tecnologia c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial
E-28050, Madrid / ES
12 / Tenorio Sanz, Santiago
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
13 / Le Pezennec, Yannick
c/ Isabel Colbrand 22 Parque Empresarial Castellana Norte
E-28050, Madrid / ES
 [2011/06]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/40]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2011/06]Keston, David Arthur
Vodafone Group Services Ltd. Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone House The Connection Newbury
Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB
Application number, filing date10168782.007.07.2010
[2011/06]
Priority number, dateES2009003042007.07.2009         Original published format: ES 200930420
[2011/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2282416
Date:09.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2282416
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2013
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04B7/04
[2011/06]
CPC:
H04B7/0689 (EP,ES,US); H04B7/0413 (EP,ES,US); H04B7/0871 (EP,ES,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Auswahl einer Übertragungstechnologie[2011/06]
English:Selecting a transmission technology[2011/06]
French:Sélection d'une technologie de transmission[2011/06]
Examination procedure27.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/40]
29.11.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/28]
28.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
29.11.2013Request for further processing filed
29.11.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.12.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201203   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2012
31.07.201607   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.2016
31.07.201708   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]GB2414365  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2008133576  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2004008648  (SCHMIDL TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2004082311  (SHIU DA-SHAN [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.