Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2404650

EP2404650 - Method and device for solid-liquid separation of solid-liquid suspensions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2013  [2013/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]For all designated states
Bayer MaterialScience AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Münnich, Christian, Dr.
Albrecht-Haushofer-Strasse 6
51377 Leverkusen / DE
02 / Köhler, Karl-Heinz, Dr.
An der Unterbahn 31
52078 Aachen-Brand / DE
03 / Westernacher, Stefan, Dr.
Eva-Vluyn-Str. 49
47906 Kempen / DE
 [2012/02]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2012/02]
Application number, filing date10169032.909.07.2010
[2012/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2404650
Date:11.01.2012
Language:DE
[2012/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.2010
ClassificationInternational:B01D39/08, D04H1/42
[2012/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fest-/Flüssig-Trennung von Fest-Flüssig-Suspensionen[2012/02]
English:Method and device for solid-liquid separation of solid-liquid suspensions[2012/02]
French:Dispositif et procédé de séparation solide-liquide de suspensions solide-liquide[2012/02]
Examination procedure12.07.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/02]
20.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2013/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0207588  (NITTA KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]US6156681  (TAMARU SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 51 - line 58; claims 1-12 * * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 11 *;
 [X]US5213882  (SASSA ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-7 *
by applicantWO0146105
 US5213882
 WO9919043