Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2290041

EP2290041 - Use of an ashless borated dispersant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/09]A lubricating oil composition
[2012/19]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
20.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineum International Limited
P.O. Box 1, Milton Hill Abingdon
Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[2011/09]
Inventor(s)01 / McTavish, Stuart James
Infineum UK Ltd
PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
02 / Strickland, Keith
Infineum UK Ltd
PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
03 / Shaw, Robert
Infineum UK Ltd
PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
 [2012/35]
Former [2011/09]01 / McTavish, Stuart James
Infineum UK Ltd PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
02 / Strickland, Keith
Infineum UK Ltd PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
03 / Shaw, Robert
Infineum UK Ltd PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Representative(s)Hart, Richard Joseph , et al
Infineum UK Ltd.
Law Department
Milton Hill
P.O. Box 1
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/09]Goddard, Frances Anna , et al
PO Box 1 Milton Hill
Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB
Application number, filing date10171303.029.07.2010
[2011/09]
Priority number, dateGB2009001798214.10.2009         Original published format: GB 0917982
EP2009001081324.08.2009         Original published format: EP 09010813
[2011/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2290041
Date:02.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2290041
Date:16.03.2011
[2011/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2290041
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:C10M133/56, // C10N10/04, C10N30/10, C10N30/12, C10N40/25, C10N40/26, C10N70/00, C10N60/14
[2011/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/09]
TitleGerman:Verwendung eines aschefreien Dispergiermittels[2012/19]
English:Use of an ashless borated dispersant[2012/19]
French:Utilisation d'un dispersant sans cendres[2012/19]
Former [2011/09]Schmierölzusammensetzung
Former [2011/09]A lubricating oil composition
Former [2011/09]Composition d'huile de lubrification
Examination procedure29.07.2010Examination requested  [2011/09]
14.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2012Fee for grant paid
03.07.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
New Market Services Corporation
330 South Forth Street
Richmond, VA 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
SSM Sandmair, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/15]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013  06.06.2013  ADMISSIBLE
New Market Services Corporation
330 South Forth Street
Richmond, VA 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx, et al
Patentanwälte
P.O. Box 86 02 45
81629 München / DE
Former [2013/27]
Opponent(s)01  28.05.2013   
New Market Services Corporation
330 South Forth Street
Richmond, VA 23219 / US
Opponent's representative
Haase, Wilm-Christian
Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
03.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.12.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
03.09.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.09.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition29.10.2015Appeal received No.  T2090/15
13.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.07.2010
AL29.08.2012
AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
MK29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
SM29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE29.07.2013
LU29.07.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2015/34]HU29.07.2010
AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
MK29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
SM29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE29.07.2013
LU29.07.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/32]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
MK29.08.2012
MT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
SM29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE29.07.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
SM29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE29.07.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE29.07.2013
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2014/33]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE29.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
MC29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/52]AT29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/34]AT29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
LV29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
HR29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
Former [2013/08]AT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
NO29.11.2012
Former [2013/07]AT29.08.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008117776  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [X] 13,14 * the whole document *;
 EP2141220  [ ] (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) [ ] * claim 1 * * pages 11-14; examples 1-9 * * page 8, paragraph 40 - page 10, paragraph 45 * * page 3, paragraphs 7,10 *;
 [X]WO2009054322  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [X] 13,14 * abstract * * page 19; table 1 * * claim 1 *;
 [I]EP2055761  (CHEVRON ORONITE CO [US]) [I] 1-8,10-15 * claims 1,2,10-14, 18 * * page 17; table 3 * * page 15 - paragraphs 92-97 * * page 12 - paragraph 77 * * page 11 - paragraph 70 * * page 5 - paragraph 29 *;
 [A]US5262140  (INOUE KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 17-23 *;
 [A]EP2055762  (CHEVRON ORONITE CO [US]) [A] 1-8,10-15 * page 5 - paragraph 31 * * page 13, paragraph 87 - page 14, paragraph 98 * * claims 1,13,19 *;
 [A]WO2009085943  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 17, paragraph 66 - page 18, paragraph 67 * * claims 1-25 *;
 [X]US5739088  (INOUE KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1318188  (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8,10-15 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 9, paragraph 62 *;
 [A]US3829381  (LE SUER W) [A] 1-8,10-15 * column 1, lines 29-33 *;
 [X]US2006073990  (WINEMILLER MARK D [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]  - CHOUDHARY R B ET AL, "Lubrication potential of boron compounds: An overview", LUBRICATION SCIENCE, LEAF COPPIN PUBLISHING LTD, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/LS.3010140208, vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 0954-0075, (20020201), pages 211 - 222, (20060307), XP007915059 [A] 1-15 * pages 211-213 * * page 221 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ls.3010140208
ExaminationWO0000576
by applicantUS5498809
 US5663130
 US5705577
 US5814715
 US6022929
 US6030930
 US4952739
 US4152499
 US3087936
 US3172892
 US3215707
 US3231587
 US3272746
 US3275554
 US3381022
 US3442808
 US3565804
 US3912764
 US4110349
 US4234435
 US5777025
 US5891953
 EP0382450
 CA1335895
 GB1440219
 US4938881
 US4927551
 US5230714
 US5241003
 US5565128
 US5756431
 US5792730
 US5854186
 US4857217
 US4956107
 US4963275
 US5229022
 US4102798
 US4113639
 US4116876
 GB989409
 US5053152
 EP0208560
 US3254025
 US5430105
 US3997454
 US3819521
 US3853772
 US3907601
 US4089790
 US4584115
 EP0684298
 EP0330522