blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2287629

EP2287629 - Time of flight camera with rectangular field of illumination [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2014
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MESA Imaging AG
Technoparkstrasse 1
8005 Zürich / CH
[2013/28]
Former [2011/08]For all designated states
Oggier, Thierry
Im Stelzenacker 17
8049 Zürich / CH
For all designated states
Richter, Michael
Blumenweg 3
5621 Zufikon / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Oggier, Thierry
Im Stelzenacker 17
Zürich / CH
02 / Richter, Michael
Blumenweg 3
5621 Zufikon / CH
 [2013/28]
Former [2011/08]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Ganahl, Bernhard, et al
Patronus IP
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neumarkter Strasse 18
81673 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]Ganahl, Bernhard, et al
PATRONUS IP
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Truderinger Straße 246
81825 München / DE
Former [2011/08]Ganahl, Bernhard, et al
Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Application number, filing date10171432.730.07.2010
[2011/08]
Priority number, dateUS20090230239P31.07.2009         Original published format: US 230239 P
[2011/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2287629
Date:23.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2287629
Date:11.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2287629
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2012
ClassificationIPC:G01S17/93, G01S7/481, G02B17/06
[2013/28]
CPC:
G01S7/4814 (EP,US); H04N13/204 (US); G02B19/0019 (EP,US);
G02B19/0052 (EP,US); G02B19/0061 (EP,US); G02B5/09 (US);
H04N23/56 (US); G01S17/894 (EP); G01S17/931 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2012/15]G01S7/481, G02B17/06
Former IPC [2011/08]G01S7/481
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/08]
TitleGerman:Flugzeitkamera mit rechteckigem Beleuchtungsfeld[2011/08]
English:Time of flight camera with rectangular field of illumination[2011/08]
French:Caméra pour durée de vol dotée d'un champ d'éclairage rectangulaire[2011/08]
Examination procedure10.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.10.2012Examination requested  [2012/47]
14.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2013Fee for grant paid
09.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2012
Opposition(s)21.08.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2010
AL20.11.2013
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MK20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/30]HU30.07.2010
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MK20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/33]HU30.07.2010
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
TR20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/32]HU30.07.2010
AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/31]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CY20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
BG20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
MT20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/22]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
SM20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
MC20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/22]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
IT20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/14]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SI20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU30.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU30.07.2014
Former [2014/41]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
DK20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
CZ20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
PL20.11.2013
RO20.11.2013
SK20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
EE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT20.11.2013
BE20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
LV20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT20.11.2013
ES20.11.2013
FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI20.11.2013
HR20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI20.11.2013
LT20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
Former [2014/20]LT20.11.2013
NO20.02.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1300712  (NICOTECH LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2005138852  (YAMAUCHI TOSHIO [JP]) [A] 8 * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]US2007176192  (LEATHERDALE CATHERINE A [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figures 1-2 *;
 [Y]US2009097248  (TSAO CHIH-CHUNG [TW], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0014] - [0024]; figures 1-5 *;
 [YD]  - OGGIER T ET AL, "An all-solid-state optical range camera for 3D real-time imaging with sub-centimeter depth resolution (SwissRanger(TM))", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, (20040218), vol. 5249, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.513307, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 534 - 545, XP002432315 [YD] 1-8 * abstract * * pages 539-541 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.513307
 [A]  - Thorsten Ringbeck, "A 3D TIME OF FLIGHT CAMERA FOR OBJECT DETECTION", (20070712), URL: http://ifm.hu/obj/O1D_Paper-PMD.pdf, (20120229), XP055020618 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Tobias Möller ET AL, "Robust 3D Measurement with PMD Sensors", Zürich, (20050101), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.132.5821&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20120229), XP055020619 [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicant   - T. OGGIER ET AL., "An all solid-state optical range camera for 3D real-time imaging with sub-centimeter resolution (SwissRangerTM)", PROC. SPIE, (2003), vol. 5249, no. 65
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.