Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2255713

EP2255713 - Cleaning element and cleaning tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.11.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2010/48]For all designated states
Uni-charm Corporation
182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsuchiya, Akemi
c/o Uni-Charm Corporation Technical Center
1531-7, Aza Takasuka
Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
02 / Tanaka, Yoshinori
c/o Uni-Charm Corporation Technical Center
1531-7, Aza Takasuka
Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
 [2013/52]
Former [2010/48]01 / Tsuchiya, Akemi
c/o Uni-Charm Corporation Technical Center 1531-7, Aza Takasuka Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
02 / Tanaka, Yoshinori
c/o Uni-Charm Corporation Technical Center 1531-7, Aza Takasuka Toyohama-cho Wadahama
Kanonji-shi, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Former [2010/48]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling Partnership Müllerstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date10171437.604.09.2007
[2010/48]
Priority number, dateJP2006024721512.09.2006         Original published format: JP 2006247215
[2010/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2255713
Date:01.12.2010
Language:EN
[2010/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2255713
Date:05.01.2011
[2011/01]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2255713
Date:18.05.2011
[2011/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2255713
Date:25.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:A47L13/20, A47L13/16, A47L13/24
[2010/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/48]
TitleGerman:Reinigungselement und Reinigungswerkzeug[2010/48]
English:Cleaning element and cleaning tool[2010/48]
French:Élément de nettoyage et outil de nettoyage[2010/48]
Examination procedure25.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
02.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
02.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.11.2013Fee for grant paid
14.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07806683.4  / EP2080471
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070806683) is  19.11.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.09.2014  29.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim/Bergstrasse / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich Patentanwälte PartmbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/45]
Opponent(s)01  23.09.2014  29.09.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim/Bergstrasse / DE
Opponent's representative
Banse & Steglich
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/44]
Opponent(s)01  23.09.2014   
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim/Bergstrasse / DE
Opponent's representative
Steglich, Gregor
Banse & Steglich Patentanwaltskanzlei
Herzog-Heinrich-Straße 23
80336 München / DE
30.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0101/17
14.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
AT, ES, TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE
02.11.2011Request for further processing filed
02.11.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
02.11.2011Request for further processing filed
02.11.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
02.11.2011Request for further processing filed
02.11.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.09.2007
AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
TR25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE04.09.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU04.09.2007
AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE04.09.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/29]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE04.09.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
MT25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE04.09.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/25]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE04.09.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE04.09.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU04.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/24]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU04.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU04.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/50]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/39]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/36]BE25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
Former [2014/34]BE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/25]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/22]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT25.12.2013
Documents cited:Search[XPI]EP1731076  (YAMADA CHIYOE [JP]) [XP] 1,2,4,6-9 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-3,11-13 * [I] 5;
 [X]US2002148061  (TANAKA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9 * figures 1-6 *
by applicantJPH09154791